This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2021 at 03:24:16 (UTC).

PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC, PATENT LITIGATION

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 PROVEN NETWORKS, LLC, PATENT LITIGATION was filed as an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-MC-02959

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Counter Defendants, Plaintiffs and Defendants

SonicWall Inc.

Proven Networks, LLC

Defendants, Counter Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs

Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company

Amazon Web Services, Inc.

Dell, Inc.

EMC Corporation

Cisco Systems, Inc.

Proven Networks, LLC

Dell Technologies, Inc.

NetApp, Inc.

Amazon.Com, Inc.

Aruba Networks, Inc.

Solarwinds Corp.

Arista Networks, Inc.

Aruba Networks, LLC

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Counter Defendant, Plaintiff and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

Kent N. Shum

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Paul A. Kroeger

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Alice E. Snedeker

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree Street Ne, Ste. 1700

Atlanta, GA 30309

Jun Zheng

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

900 S Capital Of Texas Hwy Suite 300

Austin, TX 78746

Matthew C. Gaudet

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30309-3929

Andrea L. Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

Po Box 1231

Longview, TX 75606

Charles Everingham, IV

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Claire Abernathy Henry

Attorney at Ward Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Pkwy

Longview, TX 75604

T. John Ward, Jr.

Attorney at Ward Smith & Hill, PLLC

P.O. Box 1231

Longview, TX 75606

Defendant, Counter Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

Ashbey N. Morgan

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 2100

Dallas, TX 75201

Barry K. Shelton

Attorney at Shelton Coburn LLP

311 Rr 620 S, Suite 205

Austin, TX 78734-4775

Johnson Kuncheria

Attorney at Fenwick and West LLP

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041

Ravi Ranganath

Attorney at c/o Fenwick & West LLP

801 California Street, Mountain View

Mountain View, CA 95376

Cynthia D. Vreeland

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr, LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Jason Kipnis

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

2600 El Camino Real, Suite 400

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Stephanie Lin

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Kent N. Shum

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jonathan Ma

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Paul A. Kroeger

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Mark D. Fowler

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

2000 University Avenue

East Palo Alto, CA 94303-2214

Sangwon Sung

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

2000 University Avenue

East Palo Alto, CA 94303-2214

38 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

57 #1

Proposed Order

#57

(#57) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Kent Shum by Proven Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#56

(#56) ORDER GRANTING #55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew D. Weiss. Attorney added for Proven Networks, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#55

(#55) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reza Mirzaie for Andrew D. Weiss ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15283648) by on behalf of Proven Networks, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#54

(#54) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Hoffman on behalf of Proven Networks, LLC. Attorney Adam Hoffman added to party Proven Networks, LLC(pty:pla) (Hoffman, Adam) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

26 #1

Proposed Order

#26

Text Order GRANTING #26 Motion to Substitute Party entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JGlc) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

25 #1

Proposed Order

#25

Text Order GRANTING #25 Motion to Substitute Party entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JGlc) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #1

Consent Order

#1

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Kent Shum by Proven Networks, LLC. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (WMlc) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Kent Shum by Proven Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #26 Motion to Substitute Party entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JGlc) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #25 Motion to Substitute Party entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (JGlc) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER GRANTING #55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew D. Weiss. Attorney added for Proven Networks, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Reza Mirzaie for Andrew D. Weiss ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15283648) by on behalf of Proven Networks, LLC. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Hoffman on behalf of Proven Networks, LLC. Attorney Adam Hoffman added to party Proven Networks, LLC(pty:pla) (Hoffman, Adam) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) STATUS REPORT (Supplemental Status Report Regarding Motion for Inter-District Transfer) by NetApp, Inc.. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Austin Michael Schnell on behalf of Solarwinds Corp.. Attorney Austin Michael Schnell added to party Solarwinds Corp.(pty:dft) (Schnell, Austin) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Updated Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jkda) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RESETTING MARKMAN HEARING. Markman Hearing set for 4/23/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (mc5) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER CANCELLING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above entitled and numbered case having been set for TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE on Friday, November 06, 2020 at 09:30 AM is hereby CANCELLED until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER SETTING MARKMAN HEARING, Markman Hearing set for 4/23/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATUS REPORT Re: Case Readiness by Proven Networks, LLC. (Kroeger, Paul) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick C. Clutter on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc.. Attorney Patrick C. Clutter added to party Cisco Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) (Clutter, Patrick) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS PATENT CASE: Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketRECEIVED Member Case from Eastern District of Texas: Proven Networks, LLC v. Cisco Systems, Inc., 2:20cv74, Assigned case number 6:20cv983. (kc) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by the Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols In re: Proven Networks LLC, Patent Litigation MDL 2959. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that pursuant to 28 USC 1407, the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Western District of Texas are transferred to the Western District of Texas and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Alan D. Albright for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. MASTER DOCKET CASE NUMBER ASSIGNMENT 6:20-MC-2959. Signed by Judge Unassigned. (kc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2020: #1 Consent Order) (kc). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonicwall, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Arista Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SolarWinds Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ARUBA NETWORKS INC. is a litigant