This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/28/2022 at 09:25:41 (UTC).

Prout et al v. Selective Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 Prout filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Selective Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jay C. Zainey and Karen Wells Roby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03018

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Troy Prout

Yolanda Prout

Defendants

Selective Insurance Company of America

Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast

Interested Party

Hurricane Ida Program Administrator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

K. Adam Avin

Attorney at Irpino, Avin & Hawkins (New Orleans)

2216 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Anthony D. Irpino

Attorney at Irpino, Avin & Hawkins (New Orleans)

2216 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Brent M. Burns

Attorney at The Monson Law Firm, LLC

5 Sanctuary Boulevard, Suite 101

Mandeville, LA 70471

Matthew D. Monson

Attorney at The Monson Law Firm, LLC

5 Sanctuary Blvd., Suite 101

Mandeville, LA 70471

John D. Mineo, IV

Attorney at The Monson Law Firm, LLC

5 Sanctuary Blvd., Suite 101

Mandeville, LA 70471

Interested Party Attorney

Francis Joseph Lobrano

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint, as to Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast answer due 11/8/2022. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/24/2022. (mmm) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burns, Brent) Modified text/event/referral on 10/21/2022 (mmm). (Entered: 10/21/2022)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burns, Brent) Modified on 10/21/2022 (mmm). (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER OF RECUSAL: IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court reallot this matter to another section of this Court. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/19/2022.(pp)(NEF:Sections A & E) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#11

(#11) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Blackrock, Inc. for Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast (Burns, Brent) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burns, Brent) Modified on 10/19/2022 (pp). (Entered: 10/18/2022)

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast filed by Troy Prout, Yolanda Prout. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Avin, K.) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast answer due 10/18/2022. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 09/28/2022. (ko) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Brent M. Burns added to party Selective Insurance Company of America(pty:dft).(Burns, Brent) Modified text on 9/27/2022 (pp). (Entered: 09/26/2022)

#5

(#5) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 09/14/22.(my) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint, as to Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast answer due 11/8/2022. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/24/2022. (mmm) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. 1) Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section A, Judge Jay C. Zainey. 2) Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. 3) Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action. (mmm) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burns, Brent) Modified text/event/referral on 10/21/2022 (mmm). (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burns, Brent) Modified on 10/21/2022 (mmm). (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER OF RECUSAL: IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court reallot this matter to another section of this Court. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/19/2022.(pp)(NEF:Sections A & E) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Blackrock, Inc. for Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast (Burns, Brent) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burns, Brent) Modified on 10/19/2022 (pp). (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast filed by Troy Prout, Yolanda Prout. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Avin, K.) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1, nongovernmental corporate parties must file a disclosure statement with their first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. IT IS ORDERED that any nongovernmental corporate parties in this matter file the required disclosure statement within seven (7) days of this order. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast answer due 10/18/2022. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 09/28/2022. (ko) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Brent M. Burns added to party Selective Insurance Company of America(pty:dft).(Burns, Brent) Modified text on 9/27/2022 (pp). (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 09/14/22.(my) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS-CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/26/2022.(pp) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Selective Insurance Company of America. (pp) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mb) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Selective Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9521557) filed by Troy Prout, Yolanda Prout. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney K. Adam Avin added to party Troy Prout(pty:pla), Attorney K. Adam Avin added to party Yolanda Prout(pty:pla).(Avin, K.) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hurricane Ida Program Administrator is a litigant

Latest cases where Selective Insurance Company of America is a litigant