This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2020 at 09:07:59 (UTC).

Protocol Conversion Solutions LLC v. RingCentral, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Protocol Conversion Solutions LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against RingCentral, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02813

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Protocol Conversion Solutions LLC

Defendant

RingCentral, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Isaac Philip Rabicoff

Attorney at Rabicoff Law LLC

73 West Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Protocol Conversion Solutions LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant RingCentral, Inc.. RingCentral, Inc. answer due 11/2/2020. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 11/16/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 11/2/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/9/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/17/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

7 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#7

(#7) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#6

(#6) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to RingCentral, Inc. by Plaintiff Protocol Conversion Solutions LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isaac Philip Rabicoff on behalf of Protocol Conversion Solutions LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against RingCentral, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7491165)Attorney Isaac Philip Rabicoff added to party Protocol Conversion Solutions LLC(pty:pla), filed by Protocol Conversion Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#11) Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 10/21/2020. Text Only Entry (jgonz, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Protocol Conversion Solutions LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant RingCentral, Inc.. RingCentral, Inc. answer due 11/2/2020. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 11/16/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 11/2/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/9/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/17/2020. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to RingCentral, Inc. by Plaintiff Protocol Conversion Solutions LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isaac Philip Rabicoff on behalf of Protocol Conversion Solutions LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against RingCentral, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7491165)Attorney Isaac Philip Rabicoff added to party Protocol Conversion Solutions LLC(pty:pla), filed by Protocol Conversion Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less