This case was last updated from PACER on 08/04/2020 at 12:04:10 (UTC).

Prosser v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 Prosser filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. Myers, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00240

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard E. Myers, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Prosser

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

L. Lamar Armstrong, Jr.

Attorney at The Armstrong Law Firm, P.A.

602 South Third Street, P. O. Box 27

Smithfield, NC 27577

Law Lamar Armstrong, III

Attorney at The Armstrong Law Firm, P.A.

602 South Third Street, P.O. Box 27

Smithfield, NC 27577

Defendant Attorneys

Diane K. Pappayliou

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

6752 Rock Spring Road, Suite 310

Wilmington, NC 28405

Shelley Walters Coleman

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

6752 Rock Spring Road, Suite 310

Wilmington, NC 28405

J. Scott Lewis

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

6752 Rock Spring Road, Suite 310

Wilmington, NC 28405

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER Appointing Mediator David L. Brown. Counsel is reminded to read the Order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/27/2020. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#17

(#17) Selection of David L. Brown as mediator filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/31/2021. Mediation Deadline set for 4/30/2021. Motions due by 6/15/2021. This action will be set for trial by separate order. Counsel is reminded to read the Order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 7/24/2020. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#15

(#15) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/2/2020. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

13 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Farm policy

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Farm policy) (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#12

(#12) Notice of Appearance filed by L. Lamar Armstrong, Jr on behalf of Jason Prosser. (Armstrong, L.) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#11

(#11) Financial Disclosure Statement by Jason Prosser (Armstrong, Law) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Diane K. Pappayliou on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Pappayliou, Diane) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Shelley Walters Coleman on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Coleman, Shelley) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#4

(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by J. Scott Lewis on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Johnston County file

#1

Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, . (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER Appointing Mediator David L. Brown. Counsel is reminded to read the Order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/27/2020. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Selection of David L. Brown as mediator filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/31/2021. Mediation Deadline set for 4/30/2021. Motions due by 6/15/2021. This action will be set for trial by separate order. Counsel is reminded to read the Order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 7/24/2020. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReferred the #15 Rule 26(f) Report to the United States Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank for an order on scheduling. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/2/2020. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREMINDER TO COUNSEL regarding #13 . Pursuant to Judge Myers Practice Preferences, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of any motion, memorandum, or brief which exceeds 30 pages or of any exhibits which exceed a total of 30 pages, by mailing or delivering to the attention of the Clerk, U.S. District Court, 1003 South 17th Street, Wilmington, NC 28401. The courtesy copies of any motion, memorandum, or brief and supporting exhibits which exceed a combined total of 100 pages shall be submitted in a three-ring binder. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Farm policy) (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Appearance filed by L. Lamar Armstrong, Jr on behalf of Jason Prosser. (Armstrong, L.) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Financial Disclosure Statement by Jason Prosser (Armstrong, Law) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, . (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed Order granting extension to answer) (Lewis, J.) Modified on 6/8/2020 to correct document description (Waddell, K.). (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Waddell, K.) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, L. Lamar Armstrong, III of The Armstrong Law Firm, PLLC at 602 S. Third Street, P. O. Box 27, Smithfield, NC 27577 mailed via US Mail on June 5, 2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Diane K. Pappayliou on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Pappayliou, Diane) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Shelley Walters Coleman on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Coleman, Shelley) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by J. Scott Lewis on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Johnston County Superior Court, case number 20 CVS 1396. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5455574), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Johnston County file, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet) (Lewis, J.) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less