This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2019 at 07:15:22 (UTC).

ProSource Discounts, Inc. v. Kipp K. Dye et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 ProSource Discounts, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Kipp K Dye. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Chooljian, Christina A. Snyder and Andre Birotte Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00489

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

Presiding Judges

Christina A. Snyder

Andre Birotte Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ProSource Discounts, Inc.

Defendants

Does 1-10, inclusive

Performance Solutions, LLC

Kipp K. Dye

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Matthew Lowry

Attorney at Lowry Blixseth LLP

23632 Calabasas Road Suite 201

Calabasas, CA 91302

Defendant Attorneys

Asheesh Paul Puri

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

James E Doroshow

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS KIPP K. DYE AND PERFORMANCE SOLUTIONS, LLC TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY 30 DAYS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #14 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline to respond to the Complaint is 4/22/2019. (gk) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 22, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Kipp K. Dye, Performance Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Puri, Asheesh) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#13

(#13) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Performance Solutions, LLC, Kipp K. Dye.(Attorney Asheesh Paul Puri added to party Kipp K. Dye(pty:dft), Attorney Asheesh Paul Puri added to party Performance Solutions, LLC(pty:dft))(Puri, Asheesh) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#12

(#12) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:19-cv-00489 AB(JCx). (rn) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-00489 DMG(JCx). (rn) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kipp K. Dye. (lh) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by ProSource Discounts, Inc.. (Lowry, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ProSource Discounts, Inc., (Lowry, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff ProSource Discounts, Inc.. (Lowry, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ProSource Discounts, Inc.. (Lowry, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23080443 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff ProSource Discounts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Attorney Scott Matthew Lowry added to party ProSource Discounts, Inc.(pty:pla))(Lowry, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS KIPP K. DYE AND PERFORMANCE SOLUTIONS, LLC TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY 30 DAYS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #14 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline to respond to the Complaint is 4/22/2019. (gk) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 22, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Kipp K. Dye, Performance Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Puri, Asheesh) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Performance Solutions, LLC, Kipp K. Dye.(Attorney Asheesh Paul Puri added to party Kipp K. Dye(pty:dft), Attorney Asheesh Paul Puri added to party Performance Solutions, LLC(pty:dft))(Puri, Asheesh) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:19-cv-00489 AB(JCx). (rn) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-00489 DMG(JCx). (rn) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Performance Solutions, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kipp K. Dye. (lh) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by ProSource Discounts, Inc.. (Lowry, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ProSource Discounts, Inc., (Lowry, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff ProSource Discounts, Inc.. (Lowry, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ProSource Discounts, Inc.. (Lowry, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23080443 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff ProSource Discounts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Attorney Scott Matthew Lowry added to party ProSource Discounts, Inc.(pty:pla))(Lowry, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Performance Solutions LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Asheesh Paul Puri

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James E Doroshow