This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2019 at 07:23:55 (UTC).

PROQUEST, LLC v. E-Technologies Solutions Corp.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 PROQUEST, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against E-Technologies Solutions Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephanie Dawkins Davis and Linda V. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10043

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephanie Dawkins Davis

Presiding Judge

Linda V. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PROQUEST, LLC

Proquest LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

E-Technologies Solutions Corp.

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Proquest LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Daniel G. Kielczewski

Attorney at Abbott Nicholson

300 River Place, Suite 3000

Detroit, MI 48207-4225

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Kevin J. Campbell

Attorney at Floyd E. Allen & Associates, P.C.

3011 West Grand Boulevard, Suite 2500

Detroit, MI 48202

Luis E. Gomez

Attorney at Garcia Law Group, PLLC

3011 West Grand Blvd., Suite 2500

Detroit, MI 48202

 

Court Documents

13 #7

Exhibit F.Letter, Re: Cease and Desist, dated 1/15/19.

13 #6

Exhibit E.Letter, dated 12/5/18.

13 #5

Exhibit D.Letter, dated 1/2/19.

13 #4

Exhibit C.Declaration Of Statement Of Account, dated 2/25/19.

13 #3

Exhibit B.Letter, Re: Notice of Termination of Distributor Agreement, dated 12/4

13 #2

Exhibit A.Distributor Agreement, 6/1/14.

13 #1

Index of Exhibits

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #2

Exhibit A-C

7 #1

Index of Exhibits

#7

#6

#5

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Proquest LLC against E-Technologies Solutions Corp.. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A.Distributor Agreement, 6/1/14., #3 Exhibit B.Letter, Re: Notice of Termination of Distributor Agreement, dated 12/4/18., #4 Exhibit C.Declaration Of Statement Of Account, dated 2/25/19., #5 Exhibit D.Letter, dated 1/2/19., #6 Exhibit E.Letter, dated 12/5/18., #7 Exhibit F.Letter, Re: Cease and Desist, dated 1/15/19.) (Kielczewski, Daniel) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by Proquest LLC. (Kielczewski, Daniel) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *02/06/19*. Designated lead case number is *19-10043*. (DPer) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER consolidating cases 19-10043 and 19-10251. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (DPer) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Consolidating Cases and Requiring Filing of Complaint as Counter-Complaint. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by E-Technologies Solutions Corp. (Gomez, Luis) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by E-Technologies Solutions Corp. against Proquest LLC by E-Technologies Solutions Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-C) (Gomez, Luis) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Campbell on behalf of E-Technologies Solutions Corp.. (Campbell, Kevin)[WITH CORRECTED TITLE] Modified on 1/25/2019 (DPer). (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Campbell on behalf of E-Technologies Solutions Corp.. (Campbell, Kevin) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Luis E. Gomez on behalf of E-Technologies Solutions Corp.. (Gomez, Luis) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *E-Technologies Solutions Corp.* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by PROQUEST, LLC (Kielczewski, Daniel) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by PROQUEST, LLC against E-Technologies Solutions Corp.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7053587 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): 15th Judicial Circuit Court in and for Palm Beach County, Florida, 502019CA000102, Judge Unknown] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Distributor Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Termination Letter, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Declaration of Account) (Kielczewski, Daniel) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where E-Technologies Solutions, Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where PROQUEST, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel G. Kielczewski