Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2021 at 11:04:24 (UTC).

Proofpoint Incorporated et al v. Facebook Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 Proofpoint Incorporated filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Facebook Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane J Humetewa and Dominic W Lanza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00226

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Diane J Humetewa

Dominic W Lanza

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wombat Security Technologies Incorporated

Proofpoint Incorporated

Defendants

Instagram Limited Liability Company

Facebook Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Dunning Titus

Attorney at Hartman Titus PLC

7114 E Stetson Dr., Ste. 205

Scottsdale, AZ 85251-3250

Bradley P Hartman

Attorney at Hartman Titus PLC

3507 N Central Ave., Ste. 101

Phoenix, AZ 85012-2121

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Proofpoint Incorporated, Wombat Security Technologies Incorporated. (Hartman, Bradley) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER OF RECUSAL: IT IS ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by the Clerk of Court, by random lot, to the Honorable Dominic W. Lanza, United States District Judge. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-21-00226-PHX-DWL. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/1/2021. (LFIG) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that no later than noon on March 3, 2021, Plaintiffs shall show cause in writing for failure to comply with 35 U.S.C. 290 and/or 15 U.S.C 1116, and Rule 3.1(c) of the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/26/2021. (LFIG) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER (SECOND NOTICE): Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiffs shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiffs must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading. (LFIG) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/11/2021. (LFIG) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

4 #1

AO 121

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(REM) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19147572. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00226-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Proofpoint Incorporated, Wombat Security Technologies Incorporated.(Hartman, Bradley) (REM) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19147572 filed by Proofpoint Incorporated, Wombat Security Technologies Incorporated.(Hartman, Bradley) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause (Doc. #7 ) is satisfied. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/2/21. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Proofpoint Incorporated, Wombat Security Technologies Incorporated. (Hartman, Bradley) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF RECUSAL: IT IS ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by the Clerk of Court, by random lot, to the Honorable Dominic W. Lanza, United States District Judge. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-21-00226-PHX-DWL. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/1/2021. (LFIG) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that no later than noon on March 3, 2021, Plaintiffs shall show cause in writing for failure to comply with 35 U.S.C. 290 and/or 15 U.S.C 1116, and Rule 3.1(c) of the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/26/2021. (LFIG) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER (SECOND NOTICE): Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiffs shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiffs must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading. (LFIG) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/11/2021. (LFIG) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(REM) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19147572. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00226-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Proofpoint Incorporated, Wombat Security Technologies Incorporated.(Hartman, Bradley) (REM) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19147572 filed by Proofpoint Incorporated, Wombat Security Technologies Incorporated.(Hartman, Bradley) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROOFPOINT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Instagram, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant