This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/21/2019 at 07:01:14 (UTC).

Proofpoint, Inc. et al v. Vade Secure, Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 Proofpoint, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Vade Secure, Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maxine M. Chesney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-04238

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maxine M. Chesney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cloudmark LLC

Proofpoint, Inc.

Defendants

Vade Secure, Incorporated

Olivier Lemarie

Vade Secure SASU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Iman Lordgooei

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

50 California St 22Nd Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

Sean Sang-Chul Pak

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

50 California, Floor 22

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jodie W. Cheng

Attorney at JWC Legal

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, 36Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant Attorney

Colin H. Murray

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, 11Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3802

 

Court Documents

29 #1

Proposed Order Granting Defendants Vade Secure, Incorporated, Vade Secure SASU,

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

22 #1

Declaration of Colin H. Murray in Support of Stipulation Extending Time

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #4

Exhibit D

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION to Dismiss - Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Olivier Lemarie, Vade Secure SASU, Vade Secure, Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 9/30/2019. Replies due by 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Vade Secure, Incorporated, Vade Secure SASU, and Olivier Lemarie's Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Murray, Colin) (Filed on 9/16/2019) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Certificate of Interested Entities by Olivier Lemarie (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 9/16/2019) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Certificate of Interested Entities by Vade Secure SASU (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 9/16/2019) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vade Secure SASU identifying Corporate Parent LLG Capital for Vade Secure SASU. (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 9/16/2019) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Certificate of Interested Entities by Vade Secure, Incorporated (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 9/16/2019) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vade Secure, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Vade Secure SASU for Vade Secure, Incorporated. (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 9/16/2019) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re #23 Order on Stipulation, Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 11/8/2019 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Defendants' time to file responsive pleadings to plaintiffs' complaint is extended to and including September 16, 2019. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued from October 25, 2019, to November 8, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 19, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, Stipulation Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Olivier Lemarie, Vade Secure SASU, Vade Secure, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Colin H. Murray in Support of Stipulation Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint)(Murray, Colin) (Filed on 8/15/2019) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Proofpoint, Inc., Cloudmark LLC. Vade Secure SASU served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (Affidavit of Service of French huissier de justice) (Lordgooei, Iman) (Filed on 8/12/2019) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2019
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cloudmark LLC, Proofpoint, Inc... (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 7/24/2019) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Docket(#8) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/7/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Iman Lordgooei as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Proofpoint, Inc. and Cloudmark LLC (Lordgooei, Iman) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Cloudmark LLC, Proofpoint, Inc. (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Cloudmark LLC, Proofpoint, Inc. (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13546693.). Filed by Proofpoint, Inc., Cloudmark LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pak, Sean) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROOFPOINT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colin H. Murray