This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2021 at 07:00:06 (UTC).

Promotional Headwear Int'l v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., The

Case Summary

On 04/24/2020 Promotional Headwear Int'l filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc , The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gwynne E. Birzer and Julie A. Robinson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02211

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gwynne E. Birzer

Presiding Judge

Julie A. Robinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Promotional Headwear Int'l

Defendant

Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dawn Marie Parsons

Attorney at Shaffer Lombardo Shurin, PC - KC

2001 Wyandotte

Kansas City, MO 64108

Bradley Wilders

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson, LLP - KC

460 Nichols Road, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64112

Joseph M. Feierabend

Attorney at Miller Schirger, LLC

4520 Main Street, Suite 1570

Kansas City, MO 64111

John J. Schirger

Attorney at Miller Schirger, LLC

4520 Main Street, Suite 1570

Kansas City, MO 64111

Richard F. Lombardo

Attorney at Shaffer Lombardo Shurin, PC - KC

2001 Wyandotte

Kansas City, MO 64108

Christopher Curtis Shank

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson, LLP - KC

460 Nichols Road, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64112

Patrick J. Stueve

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson, LLP - KC

460 Nichols Road, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64112

J. Kent Emison

Attorney at Langdon & Emison - Lexington

911 Main Street, Po Box 220

Lexington, MO 64067

Michael Barzee

Attorney at Shaffer Lombardo Shurin, PC - KC

2001 Wyandotte

Kansas City, MO 64108

Matthew W. Lytle

Attorney at Miller Schirger, LLC

4520 Main Street, Suite 1570

Kansas City, MO 64111

Rachael D. Longhofer

Attorney at Shaffer Lombardo Shurin, PC - KC

2001 Wyandotte

Kansas City, MO 64108

Brett A. Emison

Attorney at Langdon & Emison - Lexington

911 Main Street, Po Box 220

Lexington, MO 64067

Abby McClellan

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson, LLP - KC

460 Nichols Road, Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64112

Patricia Lynn Campbell

Attorney at Langdon & Emison - Kansas City

1828 Swift Avenue, Suite 303

Kansas City, MO 64116

Defendant Attorneys

Kelvin J. Fisher

Attorney at Wallace Saunders Austin Brown & Enochs Chartered - OP

10111 West 87Th Street

Overland Park, KS 66212

Ericka C. Hammett

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP - WI

250 East Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 800

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Daniel G. Litchfield

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo

303 West Madison Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael L. Brown

Attorney at Wallace Saunders Austin Brown & Enochs Chartered - OP

10111 West 87Th Street

Overland Park, KS 66212

 

Court Documents

47 #1

Transmittal Letter

#47

#46

#45

#44

43 #1

Preliminary Record

#43

#42

#41

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: DISMISSING appeal (Appeal No. 21-3000). (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(hw) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re #42 Notice of Appeal ( Appeal No. 21-3000) (hw) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: No Transcript Required filed by Promotional Headwear Int'l re #42 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment (Stueve, Patrick) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 1/4/2021 and assigned Appeal No. 21-3000 re #42 Notice of Appeal filed by Promotional Headwear Int'l. (hw) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #42 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record)(hw) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #41 Judgment by Plaintiff Promotional Headwear Int'l. Filing fee $ 505, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5371597. (Stueve, Patrick) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) JUDGMENT. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/3/2020. (hw) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 12/3/2020. (hw) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Patricia Lynn Campbell on behalf of Promotional Headwear Int'l (Campbell, Patricia) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) RESPONSE to #36 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Promotional Headwear Int'l. (Stueve, Patrick) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., The(Brown, Michael) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., The (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for attorney Ericka C. Hammett to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5171630.) by Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., The (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Michael) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for attorney Daniel G. Litchfield to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5171625.) by Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., The (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Michael) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael L. Brown on behalf of Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., The. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., The. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Promotional Headwear Int'l - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Stueve, Patrick) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Promotional Headwear Int'l. (Stueve, Patrick) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5125749.), filed by Promotional Headwear Int'l. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stueve, Patrick) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Barzee

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachael D. Longhofer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abby McClellan