This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2020 at 09:31:11 (UTC).

Project Veritas et al v. Schmidt et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Project Veritas filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Schmidt. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jolie A. Russo and Michael W. Mosman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01435

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jolie A. Russo

Michael W. Mosman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Project Veritas Action Fund

Project Veritas

Defendants

Michael Schmidt

Oregon Attorney General Ellen Rosenblum

Ellen Rosenblum

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Barr

444 N. Michigan Avenue, Ste. 1200

Chicago, IL 60611

Eric C. Winters

Attorney at Eric Winters

30710 Sw Magnolia Ave

Wilsonville, OR 97070-9745

Stephen Klein

Attorney at Barr & Klein PLLC

1629 K Street Nw, Ste. 300

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorneys

Carla Scott

Attorney at Oregon Department of Justice

100 Sw Market Street

Portland, OR 97201

Brian Simmonds Marshall

Attorney at Oregon Department of Justice

100 Sw Market Street

Portland, OR 97201

Shaunee Vanessa Morgan

Attorney at Oregon Department of Justice

100 Sw Market Street

Portland, OR 97201

 

Court Documents

#31

#29

#26

23 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

#22

11 #3

Attachment C

11 #2

Attachment B

11 #1

Attachment A

#11

#5

#3

#2

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule Joint case management plan. Filed by Ellen Rosenblum, Michael Schmidt. (Marshall, Brian) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docket(#30) Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Rule 16 Conference is set for 10/28/2020 at 11:00AM in Portland by telephone before Judge Michael W. Mosman. The court will be sending out the contact information. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (eo) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Compel #22 is DENIED as moot with leave to refile. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MINUTES of Proceedings: Preliminary Injunction Heating held before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Order DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 for the reasons stated on the record. Parties' Joint Case Management Plan is due 10/21/20. A telephone status conference will be held the week of 10/26/20. This case is transferred from Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo to Judge Michael W. Mosman. Benjamin Barr and Stephen Klein present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Brian Simmonds Marshall and Shaunee V. Morgan present as counsel for defendant(s). (Court Reporter Bonita Shumway.) Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (dls) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Notice of Appearance of Shaunee Vanessa Morgan appearing on behalf of Ellen Rosenblum, Michael Schmidt Filed by on behalf of Ellen Rosenblum, Michael Schmidt. (Morgan, Shaunee) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction with memorandum in support of motion #11 . Oral Argument is set for 10/7/2020 at 09:00AM in Portland by videoconference before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting Defendants' Motion to Compel #22 on the under advisement calendar of 10/19/2020. The request for oral argument will be considered in due course. Should the Court deem the motion appropriate for disposition with oral argument upon review of the briefings, the motion will be scheduled accordingly. (gm) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Declaration of Brian Simmonds Marshall in support of defendant's motion to compel deposition answers of James O'Keefe. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Marshall, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Motion to Compel deposition answers of James O'Keefe. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Marshall, Brian) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Stephen Klein. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7164585. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Klein, Stephen) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued Electronically as to Oregon Attorney General Ellen Rosenblum. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael Schmidt. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/28/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/25/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/25/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (rs) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Exhibit 1 to verified Complaint, #1 . Physical DVD Media for Hand Filing, Filed by All Plaintiffs. (rs) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Plaintiffs' Application/Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #3 as to Attorney Benjamin Barr. (gm) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Benjamin Barr. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7146759 #3 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Benjamin Barr. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7146759. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Barr, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Winters, Eric) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Verified Complaint. For Declaratory and Injunctive Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7144930 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Project Veritas Action Fund, Project Veritas against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons). (Winters, Eric) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Project Veritas Action Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where Project Veritas is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carla Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Simmonds Marshall