This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2020 at 11:01:19 (UTC).

Proimos v. Thriveworks Solutions, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 Proimos filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Thriveworks Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00662

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alex Proimos

Defendant

Thriveworks Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Paul Liebowitz

Attorney at Liebowitz Law Firm PLLC

11 Sunrise Plaza, Suite 305

Valley Stream, NY 11580

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER re #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint. Thriveworks Solutions, LLC shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 10/5/2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) STIPULATION for extension of time for Defendant to respond to the complaint by Alex Proimos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 8/20/2020 to change to motion event (jv2). (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE Order by Alex Proimos (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#4

(#4) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights along with copy of Complaint. (dl) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Thriveworks Solutions, LLC. (dl) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Alex Proimos. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/25/2020 to flatten image) (dl). (Entered: 06/25/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13698232). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Alex Proimos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/25/2020 to flatten image) (dl). (Entered: 06/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint. Thriveworks Solutions, LLC shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 10/5/2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION for extension of time for Defendant to respond to the complaint by Alex Proimos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 8/20/2020 to change to motion event (jv2). (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE Order by Alex Proimos (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights along with copy of Complaint. (dl) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Thriveworks Solutions, LLC. (dl) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alex Proimos. (dl) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Alex Proimos. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/25/2020 to flatten image) (dl). (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13698232). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Alex Proimos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/25/2020 to flatten image) (dl). (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less