This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/26/2022 at 08:27:14 (UTC).

Progressive Advanced Insurance Company v. Mowery et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2022 Progressive Advanced Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Mowery. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Howard F. Sachs. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-06018

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Howard F. Sachs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Progressive Advanced Insurance Company

Defendants

Troy Mowery

Melissa Mowery

William Maas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher M. Harper

Attorney at Franke, Schultz & Mullen - KCMO

8900 Ward Parkway

Kansas City, MO 64114

John L. Mullen

Attorney at Franke, Schultz & Mullen - KCMO

8900 Ward Parkway

Kansas City, MO 64114

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen Gilbert Sanders

Attorney at Sanders.Law

9800 Nw Polo Avenue, Suite 100

Kansas City, MO 64153-1394

Nicholas Zevenbergen

Attorney at Sanders.Law

9800 Nw Polo Avenue, Suite 100

Kansas City, MO 64153

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

MAP General Order

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Christopher M. Harper on behalf of Plaintiff Progressive Advanced Insurance Company.(Harper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#4

(#4) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE executed Acknowledgement filed by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (Harper, Christopher) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of appearance by Nicholas Zevenbergen on behalf of Melissa Mowery, Troy Mowery (Attorney Nicholas Zevenbergen added to party Melissa Mowery(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Zevenbergen added to party Troy Mowery(pty:dft))(Zevenbergen, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Melissa Mowery, Troy Mowery.(Attorney Stephen Gilbert Sanders added to party Melissa Mowery(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Gilbert Sanders added to party Troy Mowery(pty:dft))(Sanders, Stephen) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Exhibit A

7 #2

Exhibit B

7 #3

Exhibit C

#8

(#8) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/21/2022. Signed on 3/7/2022 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Nolte, Melissa) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company (Harper, Christopher) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order of Dismissal. The Mowerys' motion to dismiss (Doc. #7 ) is DENIED as moot, and the above captioned is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed on 3/17/2022 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Nolte, Melissa) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company (Harper, Christopher) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (Jones, Robin) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/21/2022. Signed on 3/7/2022 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Nolte, Melissa) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to dismiss case filed by Stephen Gilbert Sanders on behalf of Melissa Mowery, Troy Mowery. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/17/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sanders, Stephen) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Melissa Mowery, Troy Mowery.(Attorney Stephen Gilbert Sanders added to party Melissa Mowery(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Gilbert Sanders added to party Troy Mowery(pty:dft))(Sanders, Stephen) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of appearance by Nicholas Zevenbergen on behalf of Melissa Mowery, Troy Mowery (Attorney Nicholas Zevenbergen added to party Melissa Mowery(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Zevenbergen added to party Troy Mowery(pty:dft))(Zevenbergen, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE executed Acknowledgement filed by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. (Harper, Christopher) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS REISSUED as to William Maas. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to William Maas. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Melissa Mowery, Troy Mowery. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Christopher M. Harper on behalf of Plaintiff Progressive Advanced Insurance Company.(Harper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against William Maas, Melissa Mowery, Troy Mowery filed by Christopher M. Harper on behalf of Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7772726. Service due by 4/25/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Harper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE ADVANCED INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Gilbert Sanders(Designation Retained)