This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2020 at 09:54:27 (UTC).

Progress Residential v. Brown

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 Progress Residential filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Brown. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00813

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Progress Residential

Defendant

Angela Brown

Mcdonough, GA 30253

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elizabeth Cruikshank

Attorney at Cruikshank Ersin, LLC

Suite 680, 6065 Roswell Road, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30328

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER DENYING #15 Application to Appeal in forma pauperis. Further requests to proceed in forma pauperis should be directed by motion to the circuit court within 30 days pursuant to Fed.R.App.P.24. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/13/20. (kt) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#18

(#18) USCA Acknowledgment of #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela Brown. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 20-11284-A. (kac) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#17

(#17) Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Orders, Report and Recommendation, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #14 Notice of Appeal. (kac) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#15

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, Order on Application to Appeal in forma pauperis by Angela Brown. (kac) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#13

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Angela Brown re #12 Order on Final Report and Recommendation,, Order on Application to Appeal in forma pauperis, #13 Letter. (kt) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#12

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Angela Brown re #12 Order on Final Report and Recommendation,, Order on Application to Appeal in forma pauperis, #13 Letter. (kt) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) OBJECTIONS to #3 Report and Recommendation filed by Angela Brown. (kt) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation by Angela Brown. (kac) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#4

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation by Angela Brown. (kac) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

2 #1

Petition for Removal

#2

(#3) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the #2 Notice of Removal beREMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Henry County, Georgia for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/27/2020. (anc) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Angela Brown re #19 Order on Application to Appeal in forma pauperis. (kt) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER DENYING #15 Application to Appeal in forma pauperis. Further requests to proceed in forma pauperis should be directed by motion to the circuit court within 30 days pursuant to Fed.R.App.P.24. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/13/20. (kt) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) USCA Acknowledgment of #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela Brown. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 20-11284-A. (kac) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Orders, Report and Recommendation, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #14 Notice of Appeal. (kac) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) USCA Appeal Transmission Letter to 11th Circuit re: #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Angela Brown. (kac) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #15 APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (kac) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis by Angela Brown. (kac) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, Order on Application to Appeal in forma pauperis by Angela Brown. (kac) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing to Clerk Magistrate Court of Henry County re: #13 Remand Letter #12 Order on Final Report and Recommendation, Docket Sheet, and Clerks Certificate of Mailing. (kt) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Angela Brown re #12 Order on Final Report and Recommendation,, Order on Application to Appeal in forma pauperis, #13 Letter. (kt) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION to Appeal in forma pauperis by Angela Brown. (kac) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) OBJECTIONS to #3 Report and Recommendation filed by Angela Brown. (kt) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation by Angela Brown. (kac) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Angela Brown re #4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (anc) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Service of #3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/27/2020. (anc) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the #2 Notice of Removal beREMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Henry County, Georgia for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/27/2020. (anc) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Angela Brown. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(anc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 2/27/2020. (anc) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (tmf) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angela Brown. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Removal, #2 Notie of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less