This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 09:24:19 (UTC).

Profile Properties LLC v. West American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Profile Properties LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against West American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wyoming District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan B Johnson and Kelly H Rankin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00134

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wyoming District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan B Johnson

Referral Judge

Kelly H Rankin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Profile Properties LLC

Defendant

West American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick Michael Brady

Attorney at SUNDAHL POWERS KAPP AND MARTIN LLC

1725 Carey Avenue, Po Box 328

Cheyenne, WY 82003

Raymond W Martin

Attorney at SUNDAHL POWERS KAPP & MARTIN

P O Box 328

Cheyenne, WY 82003-0328

Defendant Attorney

John A Coppede

Attorney at HICKEY & EVANS

1800 Carey Avenue, P O Box 467

Cheyenne, WY 82003-0467

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT of Meeting and Proposed Joint Discovery and Case Management Plan and Setting Initial Pretrial Conference by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2020 at 9:30 AM by TELEPHONE from Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Guests call: Toll Free 866-434-5269 | Access code 1316504# | Join as guest Press # | Security code 1001#(Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by West American Insurance Company. (Coppede, John) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by West American Insurance Company. (Coppede, John) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to Serve Answer filed by Defendant West American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coppede, John) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John A Coppede on behalf of West American Insurance Company (Coppede, John) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

4 #6

Exhibit Exh 5 to Affidavit

4 #5

Exhibit Exh 4 to Affidavit

4 #4

Exhibit Exh 3 to Affidavit

4 #3

Exhibit Exh 2 to Affidavit

4 #2

Exhibit Exh 1 to Affidavit

4 #1

Exhibit Exh A to Notice of Compliance

#4

(#4) NOTICE in Compliance With W.S. 26-3-122 by Plaintiff Profile Properties LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Compliance, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 3 to Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 4 to Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 5 to Affidavit) (Brady, Patrick) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (Court Staff, sbh). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Consent

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Profile Properties LLC (1 summons(es) issued) Counsel - payment is due within 3 days. To pay the filing fee with a credit card, please use the event Notice of Civil Filing Fee in CM/ECF or send a check to the Clerk of US District Court, 2131 Capitol Avenue Room 2131, Cheyenne, WY 82001 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent) (Court Staff, stbd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #3 Exhibit A) (Court Staff, stbd). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT of Meeting and Proposed Joint Discovery and Case Management Plan and Setting Initial Pretrial Conference by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2020 at 9:30 AM by TELEPHONE from Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Guests call: Toll Free 866-434-5269 | Access code 1316504# | Join as guest Press # | Security code 1001#(Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by West American Insurance Company. (Coppede, John) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by West American Insurance Company. (Coppede, John) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Finding good cause, and under Local Rule 6.1(b), Defendant's unopposed motion is granted. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 24, 2020.(Court Staff, sem) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to Serve Answer filed by Defendant West American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coppede, John) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John A Coppede on behalf of West American Insurance Company (Coppede, John) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE in Compliance With W.S. 26-3-122 by Plaintiff Profile Properties LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Compliance, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit 3 to Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 4 to Affidavit, #6 Exhibit 5 to Affidavit) (Brady, Patrick) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (Court Staff, sbh). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment. Filing Fee was paid with Receipt Number: CHY033333. (Court Staff, sbh) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Profile Properties LLC, 1 issued. (Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Plaintiff Profile Properties LLC. (Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Profile Properties LLC (1 summons(es) issued) Counsel - payment is due within 3 days. To pay the filing fee with a credit card, please use the event Notice of Civil Filing Fee in CM/ECF or send a check to the Clerk of US District Court, 2131 Capitol Avenue Room 2131, Cheyenne, WY 82001 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent) (Court Staff, stbd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #3 Exhibit A) (Court Staff, stbd). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less