This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2020 at 09:32:47 (UTC).

Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc. v. MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01440

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc.

Defendant

MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Francisco M. Lopez-Romo

431 Ponce De Leon Ave., National Plaza Suite 1500

San Juan, PR 00917

Defendant Attorneys

Ivan Llado-Rodriguez

Attorney at Morell Bauza Cartagena & Dapena, LLC

Po Box 13399

San Juan, PR 00908

Edgardo Cartagena-Santiago

Attorney at Morell Cartagena & Dapena

Po Box 13399

San Juan, PR 00908

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction UNDER RULE 12(B)(1) as to MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 11/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Edgardo Cartagena-Santiago on behalf of MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. (Cartagena-Santiago, Edgardo) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time until October 22, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 10/5/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

1 #7

Summons Summons MSO

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Category Sheet Category Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Selection of Arbitrator

1 #3

Exhibit Contract between PHG and MSO

1 #2

Exhibit Normative Letter

1 #1

Exhibit Arbitration Award

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6994162.), filed by Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc.. Service due by 11/23/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit Normative Letter, #3 Exhibit Contract between PHG and MSO, #4 Exhibit Selection of Arbitrator, #5 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Summons MSO)(Lopez-Romo, Francisco) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction UNDER RULE 12(B)(1) as to MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 11/4/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Granting #4 "Motion For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint." Defendant shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 10/22/2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/22/2020. (ebb) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Noting #5 "Appearance of Counsel." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/22/2020. (ebb) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Edgardo Cartagena-Santiago on behalf of MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. (Cartagena-Santiago, Edgardo) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time until October 22, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Ivan Llado-Rodriguez on behalf of MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 10/5/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Llado-Rodriguez, Ivan) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (vdm) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6994162.), filed by Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc.. Service due by 11/23/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit Normative Letter, #3 Exhibit Contract between PHG and MSO, #4 Exhibit Selection of Arbitrator, #5 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Summons MSO)(Lopez-Romo, Francisco) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc. d/b/a Professional Hospital Guaynabo is a litigant

Latest cases where MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Francisco M. Lopez-Romo