This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2021 at 11:42:23 (UTC).

Proctor v. AECOM, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 Proctor filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against AECOM, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claude M. Hilton, John F. Anderson and Rossie D. Alston, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00033

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

Presiding Judges

Claude M. Hilton

Rossie D. Alston, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carmella Proctor

Defendants

AECOM Management Services, Inc.

AECOM, INC. doing business as AECOM Technology Corp. also known as AECOM

URS Federal Services, Inc.

AECOM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ernest Paul Francis

Attorney at Ernest P. Francis LTD

105 Oronoco Street, Suite 309

Alexandria, VA 22314

Defendant Attorneys

John Michael Remy

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC (Reston)

10701 Parkridge Blvd, Suite 300

Reston, VA 20191

Bernard George Dennis, III

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC (Reston)

10701 Parkridge Blvd, Suite 300

Reston, VA 20191

 

Court Documents

7 #4

Exhibit 4

7 #3

Exhibit 3

7 #2

Exhibit 2

7 #1

Exhibit 1

#7

6 #1

Exhibit Virginia Supreme Court Order

#6

#5

#4

3 #2

Exhibit

3 #1

Exhibit

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Removal

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by AECOM Management Services, Inc., AECOM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Remy, John) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Memorandum in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Carmella Proctor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Virginia Supreme Court Order)(Francis, Ernest) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPer RDA cambers motions set for 2/10/2021 on the pleadings (clar, ) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, ) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Hearing Date set for February 10, 2021 re #2 MOTION to Dismiss (Dennis, Bernard) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard George Dennis, III on behalf of AECOM Management Services, Inc., AECOM, INC. (Dennis, Bernard) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #2 MOTION to Dismiss. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by AECOM Management Services, Inc., AECOM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Remy, John) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Dismiss by AECOM Management Services, Inc., AECOM, INC.. (Remy, John) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr. District Judge Claude M. Hilton no longer assigned to the case. (aott, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7576673.), filed by AECOM, INC., AECOM Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Remy, John) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where URS Federal Services is a litigant

Latest cases where AECOM Management Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AECOM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ernest Paul Francis(Designation Retained)