This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2020 at 13:11:27 (UTC).

Proctor, III et al v. JP Morgan Chase & Co. et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 Proctor, III filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against JP Morgan Chase Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05360

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Synova Asset Management, LLC

Charles Herbert Proctor, III

Defendants

J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp.

J.P Morgan Securities LLC

J.P. Morgan Futures, Inc.

JP Morgan Chase & Co

John Does #1-50

Interested Party

Breakwater Trading LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vincent Briganti

Attorney at Lowey Dannenbergt, P.C.

44 South Broadway, Suite 1100

White Plains, NY 10601

David Kovel

Attorney at Kirby McInerney LLP

825 3Rd Avenue, 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Raymond P Girnys

Attorney at Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.

44 South Broadway, Suite 1100

White Plains, NY 10601

Karen M Lerner

Attorney at Kirby McInerney LLP

250 Park Avenue, Suite 820

New York, NY 10177

Johnathan Seredynski

Attorney at Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.

Suite 1100, 44 South Broadway

White Plains, NY 10601

Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek

Attorney at Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel, LLP

150 S. Wacker, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60602

Anthony Epifanio Maneiro

Attorney at Kirby Mcinerney Llp

250 Park Avenue, Suite 820

New York, NY 10177

Anthony F. Fata

Attorney at Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP

150 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Karen M. Lerner

250 Park Avenue, Suite 820

New York, NY 10177

Peter Anthony Barile, III

Attorney at Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.

44 South Broadway, Suite 1100

White Plains, NY 10601

Defendant Attorneys

Suyash Agrawal

Attorney at Massey & Gail LLP

50 E. Washington St. #400

Chicago, IL 60602

Akash M. Toprani

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street, Room 3116

New York, NY 10004

Mark W. Page

Attorney at Massey & Gail LLP

50 East Washington, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60602

Amanda Flug Davidoff

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

1700 New York Avenue, N.W., Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006-5215

Robert A. Sacks

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

1888 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#52

#51

#50

RESTRICTED

#49

#48

47 #3

Exhibit C - Billing and Expense Protocol

47 #2

Exhibit B - Kirby Resume

#47

#45

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

#1

#5

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. . Document filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC..(Lerner, Karen) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 8/13/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/13/2020 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2020..(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #48 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. . Document filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC..(Fata, Anthony) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC. Related Document Number: #45 ..(Lerner, Karen) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) DECLARATION of Karen M. Lerner in Support re: #45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases.. Document filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lowey Resume, #2 Exhibit B - Kirby Resume, #3 Exhibit C - Billing and Expense Protocol, #4 Exhibit D - Breakwater LLC, #5 Exhibit E - Endeavor LLC, #6 Exhibit F - WSJ Article).(Lerner, Karen) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. . Document filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC..(Lerner, Karen) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lowey Dannenberg P.C. and Kirby McInerney LLP as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Consolidate Related Cases. Document filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC..(Lerner, Karen) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [25 in 1:20-cv-03515-PAE et al] Letter. ENDORSEMENT; The Court adopts the proposed schedule and sets September 4, 2020 as the due date for any responses to motions to consolidate or motions to appoint lead counsel. (Motions due by 8/21/2020. Responses due by 9/4/2020) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/13/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16992558. (Lerner, Karen) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC by Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek (Tourek, Christopher) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC by Anthony F. Fata (Fata, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fata, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status hearing is set for July 22, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. At least two weeks before the hearing, the parties must discuss settlement in good faith, and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. The parties also must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court before the initial status hearing. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) by July 17, 2020. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. Second, the parties must submit a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Please note that the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report on the Court's docket, but must email (i.e., not file on the docket) the proposed Scheduling Order to the Court's proposed order inbox. The initial status hearing will be the scheduling conference contemplated by Rule 16(b). Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the initial status conference. Counsel must be prepared to discuss the status of settlement, as well as the proposed discovery plan. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process by one week before the initial status hearing, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status hearing. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Status hearing set for 7/22/2020 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (jjr, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fata, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16983074.(Fata, Anthony) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice (ec, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synova Asset Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Breakwater Trading LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp. is a litigant