This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/30/2020 at 07:37:39 (UTC).

Proctor, III et al v. JP Morgan Chase & Co. et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 Proctor, III filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against JP Morgan Chase Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Seeger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02666

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Seeger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Synova Asset Management, LLC

Charles Herbert Proctor, III

Defendants

JP Morgan Chase & Co.

J.P. Morgan Securities LLC

J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp.

John Does 1-50

J.P. Morgan Futures, Inc. (now known as J.P. Morgan Securities LLC)

J.P. Morgan Futures, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony F. Fata

Attorney at Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP

150 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Vincent Briganti

Attorney at Lowey Dannenbergt, P.C.

44 South Broadway, Suite 1100

White Plains, NY 10601

David Kovel

Attorney at Kirby McInerney LLP

825 3Rd Avenue, 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Raymond P Girnys

Attorney at Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.

44 South Broadway, Suite 1100

White Plains, NY 10601

Karen M Lerner

Attorney at Kirby McInerney LLP

250 Park Avenue, Suite 820

New York, NY 10177

Johnathan Seredynski

Attorney at Lowey Dannenberg, P.C.

Suite 1100, 44 South Broadway

White Plains, NY 10601

Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek

Attorney at Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel, LLP

150 S. Wacker, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60602

Anthony Epifanio Maneiro

Attorney at Kirby Mcinerney Llp

250 Park Avenue, Suite 820

New York, NY 10177

Defendant Attorneys

Suyash Agrawal

Attorney at Massey & Gail LLP

50 E Washington Street, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60602

Akash M. Toprani

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street, Room 3116

New York, NY 10004

Mark W. Page

Attorney at Massey & Gail LLP

50 East Washington, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60602

Amanda Flug Davidoff

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

1700 New York Avenue, N.W., Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006-5215

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The Court grants both Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Dckt. No. #27 and #28 ) Attorney Amanda Flug Davidoff and Akash M. Toprani are added as counsel for J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P. Morgan Futures, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC and JP Morgan Chase & Co. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extensions of Time (Dckt. No. #26 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff in a related action filed a motion before the MDL panel to transfer, consolidate, or coordinate this case with other Treasuries Futures Spoofing Actions in the SDNY. The Court extends the deadline for Defendants to respond to the complaint. Defendants must file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than 45 days after the filing of a consolidated amended complaint, unless an earlier date is set for JP Morgan to respond to the complaints in any of the Treasuries Futures Spoofing Actions. If there is an earlier due date in one of those Actions, then that earlier due date shall be the due date in this case, too. The parties shall file a joint initial status report and a proposed scheduling order 45 days after the filing of a consolidated amended complaint if the actions are consolidated before this Court. Defenses except insufficiency of service of process are preserved. The parties shall preserve documents as required by the Federal Rules. The parties shall keep this Court informed about the status of the motion before the MDL panel as appropriate. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17152102. (Toprani, Akash) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17152081. (Davidoff, Amanda) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION by Defendants J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P. Morgan Futures, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co. for extension of time - Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extensions of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint and to File Status Report (Page, Mark) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P. Morgan Futures, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co. (Page, Mark) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P. Morgan Futures, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co. by Suyash Agrawal (Agrawal, Suyash) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P. Morgan Futures, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co. by Mark W. Page (Page, Mark) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The status hearing previously set for July 22, 2020 is stricken. The parties shall file a Joint Initial Status Report on the docket and shall submit a Word version of the proposed scheduling order to the Court's proposed order inbox by July 17, 2020. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket11, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice (Dckt. No. #9 ) is granted. Attorney Karen M. Lerner for Charles Herbert Proctor, III and Synova Asset Management, LLC has been added. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16992558. (Lerner, Karen) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC by Christopher Phillip Taylor Tourek (Tourek, Christopher) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC by Anthony F. Fata (Fata, Anthony) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fata, Anthony) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status hearing is set for July 22, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. At least two weeks before the hearing, the parties must discuss settlement in good faith, and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. The parties also must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court before the initial status hearing. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) by July 17, 2020. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. Second, the parties must submit a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Please note that the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report on the Court's docket, but must email (i.e., not file on the docket) the proposed Scheduling Order to the Court's proposed order inbox. The initial status hearing will be the scheduling conference contemplated by Rule 16(b). Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the initial status conference. Counsel must be prepared to discuss the status of settlement, as well as the proposed discovery plan. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process by one week before the initial status hearing, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status hearing. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Status hearing set for 7/22/2020 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (jjr, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fata, Anthony) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Charles Herbert Proctor, III, Synova Asset Management, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16983074.(Fata, Anthony) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synova Asset Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant