This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/09/2022 at 08:01:25 (UTC).

PROBST v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/10/2022 PROBST filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah Evans Barker and Doris L. Pryor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01986

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNIFER M. PROBST

Defendant

ELI LILLY AND COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Peter Kondras, Jr.

Attorney at HASSLER KONDRAS MILLER LLP

100 Cherry Street

Terre Haute, IN 47807

Scott Stanton Luzi

Attorney at Walcheske & Luzi, LLC

235 N. Executive Drive, Ste 240

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant Attorneys

Joel H. Spitz

Attorney at MCGUIRE WOODS LLP (Chicago)

77 West Wacker Drive, 41St Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

Michael Ross Phillips

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

77 West Wacker Drive, Ste 41St Floor

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff JENNIFER M. PROBST . (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.(Phillips, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2022 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/16/2022.(SWM) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Joel H. Spitz on behalf of Defendant ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Spitz, Joel) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent ELI LILLY & COMPANY for ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.. (Phillips, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC INITIAL EXTENSION OF TIME, filed by Defendant ELI LILLY AND COMPANY (Phillips, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ross Phillips on behalf of Defendant ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Phillips, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Scott Stanton Luzi for JENNIFER M. PROBST added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/20/2022. (SWM) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION for Attorney(s) Scott S. Luzi to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff JENNIFER M. PROBST. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luzi, Scott) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Attorney(s) Scott S. Luzi to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7326114), filed by Plaintiff JENNIFER M. PROBST. (Luzi, Scott) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#5

(#5) RETURN of Service, filed by JENNIFER M. PROBST. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY served on 10/14/2022. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DRB) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (DRB) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff JENNIFER M. PROBST. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff JENNIFER M. PROBST . (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.(Phillips, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2022 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 1/16/2022.(SWM) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Joel H. Spitz on behalf of Defendant ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Spitz, Joel) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELI LILLY AND COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent ELI LILLY & COMPANY for ELI LILLY AND COMPANY.. (Phillips, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC INITIAL EXTENSION OF TIME, filed by Defendant ELI LILLY AND COMPANY (Phillips, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ross Phillips on behalf of Defendant ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (Phillips, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Scott Stanton Luzi for JENNIFER M. PROBST added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/20/2022. (SWM) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Attorney(s) Scott S. Luzi to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Plaintiff JENNIFER M. PROBST. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luzi, Scott) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Attorney(s) Scott S. Luzi to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7326114), filed by Plaintiff JENNIFER M. PROBST. (Luzi, Scott) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service, filed by JENNIFER M. PROBST. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY served on 10/14/2022. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DRB) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. (DRB) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peter Kondras, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff JENNIFER M. PROBST. (Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, filed by JENNIFER M. PROBST. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7316872) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Kondras, Robert) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELI LILLY AND COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel H Spitz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Ross Phillips