This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/02/2020 at 09:09:09 (UTC).

Pro Star Logistics v. Bluestem Brands

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 Pro Star Logistics filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bluestem Brands. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecilia M. Romero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00141

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Romero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pro Star Logistics

Defendant

Bluestem Brands

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathan R. Marigoni

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR LLP

201 S Main Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2221

Jason D. Boren

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR LLP

201 S Main Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2221

Defendant Attorney

Jill A Zender

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER & BIDDLE & REATH LLP

1144 15Th St Ste 3400

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Exhibit A: Broker/Shipper Transportation Agreement

2 #2

Civil Cover Sheet to Complaint

#3

#4

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #9 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (nl) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Bluestem Brands, Plaintiff Pro Star Logistics. Form due by 4/22/2020. (nl) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jill A Zender on behalf of Bluestem Brands (Zender, Jill) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Stayed per #7 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy (rks) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing of Bankruptcy Petition by Bluestem Brands (Zender, Jill) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pro Star Logistics as to Bluestem Brands served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (Boren, Jason) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Modification of Docket: Error: Complaint was filed against the plaintiff not the defendant. Correction: Docket text has been modified to reflect complaint is filed against defendants rather than plaintiff; answer records corrected. re #2 Complaint,. (tlh) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Bluestem Brands. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Pro Star Logistics identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Boren, Jason) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Bluestem Brands (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3511527) filed by Pro Star Logistics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Broker/Shipper Transportation Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet to Complaint) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero (Boren, Jason) Modified on 3/4/2020 by changing who the Complaint was filed against (tlh). (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Plaintiff Pro Star Logistics is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bluestem Brands, Inc. dba Fingerhut is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan R. Marigoni

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason D. Boren