This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/26/2021 at 09:48:52 (UTC).

Pro Machine & Engineering, Inc. v. Owners Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Pro Machine Engineering, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Owners Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathleen M. Tafoya. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00581

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Tafoya

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pro Machine & Engineering, Inc.

1001 17Th St., Suite 1150

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant

Owners Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Larry E. Bache, Jr.

Attorney at Merlin Law Group-Denver

1001 17Th Street, Suite 1150

Denver, CO 80202

Timothy Graham Burchard, II

Attorney at Merlin Law Group-Denver

1001 17Th Street, Suite 1150

Denver, CO 80202

Jonathan Edward Bukowski

Attorney at Merlin Law Group-Denver

1001 17Th Street, Suite 1150

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

John David Mereness

Attorney at Giometti & Mereness PC

501 South Cherry Street, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80246

Levi Gregory Stubbs

Attorney at Giometti & Mereness PC

501 South Cherry Street, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80246

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Mereness, John) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Larry E. Bache, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Larry E. Bache, Jr added to party Pro Machine & Engineering, Inc.(pty:pla) (Bache, Larry) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Graham Burchard, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Timothy Graham Burchard, II added to party Pro Machine & Engineering, Inc.(pty:pla) (Burchard, Timothy) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Bukowski on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party Pro Machine & Engineering, Inc.(pty:pla) (Bukowski, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Levi Gregory Stubbs on behalf of Owners Insurance CompanyAttorney Levi Gregory Stubbs added to party Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Stubbs, Levi) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John David Mereness on behalf of Owners Insurance Company (Mereness, John) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/01/2021. Consent Form due by 4/26/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/26/2021 (evaug ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER and Jury Demand to #4 Complaint by Owners Insurance Company.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Owners Insurance Company on 01/29/2021 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Owners Insurance Company, filed by Pro Machine & Engineering, Inc..(cpomm, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

1 #9

Exhibit F - Answer and Jury Demand

1 #8

Exhibit E - Affidavit of Service

1 #7

Exhibit D - Summons

1 #5

Exhibit B - Complaint and JD

1 #4

Exhibit A-2 - Owners' Articles of Incorporation

1 #3

Exhibit A-1 - Pro Machine Articles of Incorporation

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Mereness, John) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Larry E. Bache, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Larry E. Bache, Jr added to party Pro Machine & Engineering, Inc.(pty:pla) (Bache, Larry) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Graham Burchard, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Timothy Graham Burchard, II added to party Pro Machine & Engineering, Inc.(pty:pla) (Burchard, Timothy) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Bukowski on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party Pro Machine & Engineering, Inc.(pty:pla) (Bukowski, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Levi Gregory Stubbs on behalf of Owners Insurance CompanyAttorney Levi Gregory Stubbs added to party Owners Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Stubbs, Levi) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John David Mereness on behalf of Owners Insurance Company (Mereness, John) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/01/2021. Consent Form due by 4/26/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/26/2021 (evaug ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER and Jury Demand to #4 Complaint by Owners Insurance Company.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Owners Insurance Company on 01/29/2021 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Owners Insurance Company, filed by Pro Machine & Engineering, Inc..(cpomm, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Owners Insurance Company from El Paso County District Court, Case Number 2021CV30155. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7737145), filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Register of Actions, #3 Exhibit A-1 - Pro Machine Articles of Incorporation, #4 Exhibit A-2 - Owners' Articles of Incorporation, #5 Exhibit B - Complaint and JD, #6 Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit D - Summons, #8 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Service, #9 Exhibit F - Answer and Jury Demand)(Mereness, John) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Graham Burchard, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Edward Bukowski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larry E. Bache, Jr.