This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2021 at 08:41:30 (UTC).

Print Big, Inc. et al v. Covington Specialty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 Print Big, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Covington Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Lawrence King and Jacqueline Becerra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-23433

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Lawrence King

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Becerra

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Print Big, Inc.

Platinum Trading Center, LLC

Defendants

Hartford Insurance Company of Midwest

Covington Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven C Kletzkin

Attorney at STEVEN C KLETZKIN PLLC

4400 N. Federal Highway, Suite 210

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Jarret S McNeill

Attorney at Mase Tinelli, P.A.

2601 South Bayshore Drive, Suite 800

Miami, FL 33133

Defendant Attorneys

Troy Jonathan Seibert

Attorney at Butler Legal

400 N. Ashley Drive, Suite 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

Aaron Fortier

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig

400 N Ashley Drive, Suite 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

Vincent Alexander Fernandez

Attorney at Butler, Weihmuller, Katz, Craig

400 N Ashley Dr. #2300

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents [compressed]

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Interrogatories & Answers

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Sunbiz Information - Print Big

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 4 - F. Ruiz Citizenship Documents

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 5 - R. Ochoa Citizenship Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER Directing Defendant to File Estimated Length of Trial re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 9/28/2022., Motions due by 10/3/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/25/2022., Jury Trial set for 2/27/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Calendar Call set for 2/23/2023 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2022 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings to be held before Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven C Kletzkin on behalf of Platinum Trading Center, LLC, Print Big, Inc. (Kletzkin, Steven) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Order [DOC 4] by Covington Specialty Insurance Company re #4 Order, (Seibert, Troy) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Steven C Kletzkin (Kletzkin, Steven) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Steven C Kletzkin (Kletzkin, Steven) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance And Email Designation by Steven C Kletzkin on behalf of Platinum Trading Center, LLC, Print Big, Inc. (Kletzkin, Steven) Modified text on 10/1/2021 (kpe). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#14

(#14) Second Amended Corrected NOTICE of Attorney Appearance And Email Designation by Steven C Kletzkin on behalf of Platinum Trading Center, LLC, Print Big, Inc. (Kletzkin, Steven) Modified text on 10/1/2021 (kpe). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Second Amended Corrected NOTICE of Attorney Appearance And Email Designation by Steven C Kletzkin on behalf of Platinum Trading Center, LLC, Print Big, Inc. (Kletzkin, Steven) Modified text on 10/1/2021 (kpe). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance And Email Designation by Steven C Kletzkin on behalf of Platinum Trading Center, LLC, Print Big, Inc. (Kletzkin, Steven) Modified text on 10/1/2021 (kpe). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Docket(#12) Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 11 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney. Docket Text Modified by Clerk. See DE 11 . (kpe) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Notice of Attorney Appearance, #8 & #9 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (kpe) Modified text on 10/1/2021 (kpe). (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Jarret S. McNeill re #9 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name, #8 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Jarret S. McNeill has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. After filing a Notice in all pending cases, Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Steven C Kletzkin (Kletzkin, Steven) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Steven C Kletzkin (Kletzkin, Steven) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Compliance with Court's Order [DOC 4] by Covington Specialty Insurance Company re #4 Order, (Seibert, Troy) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven C Kletzkin on behalf of Platinum Trading Center, LLC, Print Big, Inc. (Kletzkin, Steven) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 9/28/2022., Motions due by 10/3/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/25/2022., Jury Trial set for 2/27/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Calendar Call set for 2/23/2023 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2022 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings to be held before Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Directing Defendant to File Estimated Length of Trial re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, filed by Covington Specialty Insurance Company Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Correction made by the clerk. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (bb) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15042125, filed by Hartford Insurance Company of Midwest. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents [compressed], #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Interrogatories & Answers, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Sunbiz Information - Print Big, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - F. Ruiz Citizenship Documents, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - R. Ochoa Citizenship Documents)(Seibert, Troy) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Troy J. Seibert