This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2020 at 07:43:56 (UTC).

Prins et al v. State of Alaska

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 Prins filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against State of Alaska. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Sedwick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00296

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Sedwick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alexander Prins, II

Toni Prins

Defendant

State of Alaska

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sara Lynne Bloom

Attorney at Law Offices of Sara L. Bloom

1120 Huffman Rd. Ste 24-785

Anchorage, AK 99515

Defendant Attorney

Siobhan McIntyre

State Of Alaska, Department Of Law (Anch - Suite 200), Office Of The Attorney General, Civil Division, 1031 W. 4Th Avenue, Suite 200

Anchorage, AK 99501

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Unissued summons re Defendant State of Alaska, (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#7

(#7) INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Siobhan McIntyre on behalf of State of Alaska (McIntyre, Siobhan) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alexander Prins, II, Toni Prins. (Bloom, Sara) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against the State of Alaska ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2787295.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Bloom, Sara) Modified on 11/13/2019 to reflect filers(PXS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by State of Alaska.(McIntyre, Siobhan) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet. (Bloom, Sara) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by State of Alaska.(McIntyre, Siobhan) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Siobhan McIntyre on behalf of State of Alaska (McIntyre, Siobhan) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • Summons Issued as to State of Alaska. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Unissued summons re Defendant State of Alaska, (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Civil Cover Sheet. (Bloom, Sara) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alexander Prins, II, Toni Prins. (Bloom, Sara) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against the State of Alaska ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2787295.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Bloom, Sara) Modified on 11/13/2019 to reflect filers(PXS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less