This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2020 at 07:51:14 (UTC).

Principe v. SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 Principe filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY BEETLESTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04918

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY BEETLESTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Principe

Defendants

SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER

, Saint Mary

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW S. ABRAMSON

Attorney at ABRAMSON EMPLOYMENT LAW LLC

790 Penllyn Blue Bell Pike, Suite 205

Blue Bell, PA 19422

Defendant Attorneys

FARA ASHLEY COHEN

Attorney at POST & SCHELL, P.C.

1600 John F Kennedy Blvd.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM

Attorney at POST & SCHELL PC

Four Penn Center, 1600 John F. Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE:A settlement conference via the internet will be held on February 9, 2021 at 2:00 p.m., before the Honorable Richard A. Lloret, United States Magistrate Judge. Judge Lloret will email a link approximately 15 minutes beforehand. Please email all participants names and emails to sheila_mccurry@paed.uscourts.gov by February 2, 2021. A status telephone call will be held on February 2, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel will provide a call-in number. (smcc) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD LLORET FOR SETTLEMENT. ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 3/29/21. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 5/24/21. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/19/20. 10/19/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) Report Of Joint Rule 26(f) meeting by SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER. (KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by FARA ASHLEY COHEN on behalf of SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER with Certificate of Service(COHEN, FARA) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

5 #2

Joint Report and Discovery Plan

5 #1

Electronic Discovery Order

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE, COUNSEL SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE DIAL IN INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov : PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/19/2020 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Discovery Order, #2 Joint Report and Discovery Plan)(amw, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER.(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM on behalf of SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER with Certificate of Service(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deborah Principe. SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (ABRAMSON, ANDREW) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14615300.), filed by Deborah Principe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(ABRAMSON, ANDREW) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE:A settlement conference via the internet will be held on February 9, 2021 at 2:00 p.m., before the Honorable Richard A. Lloret, United States Magistrate Judge. Judge Lloret will email a link approximately 15 minutes beforehand. Please email all participants names and emails to sheila_mccurry@paed.uscourts.gov by February 2, 2021. A status telephone call will be held on February 2, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel will provide a call-in number. (smcc) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD LLORET FOR SETTLEMENT. ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 3/29/21. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 5/24/21. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/19/20. 10/19/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/19/20 (amas, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Report Of Joint Rule 26(f) meeting by SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER. (KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by FARA ASHLEY COHEN on behalf of SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER with Certificate of Service(COHEN, FARA) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE, COUNSEL SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE DIAL IN INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov : PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/19/2020 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Discovery Order, #2 Joint Report and Discovery Plan)(amw, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER.(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM on behalf of SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER with Certificate of Service(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deborah Principe. SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (ABRAMSON, ANDREW) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 10/6/20 (amas, ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Deborah Principe. (JL ) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SAINT MARY MEDICAL CENTER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14615300.), filed by Deborah Principe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(ABRAMSON, ANDREW) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less