This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2019 at 07:33:11 (UTC).

Principal National Life Insurance Company v. Rothenberg

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 Principal National Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Rothenberg. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jean C. Hamilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02360

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jean C. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Principal National Life Insurance Company

Defendant

Donna T. Rothenberg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edna S. Kersting

Attorney at WILSON ELSER

55 West Monroe Street, Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60603-5001

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE Lawsuit: by Plaintiff Principal National Life Insurance Company (Kersting, Edna) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit F (Response June 24, 2019)

#4

(#4) WAIVER of Service issued defendantDonna T. Rothenberg. sent to Donna T. Rothenberg on 08/20/2019 filed by Principal National Life Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2019. (Kersting, Edna) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B (Agreement and Acceptance of Delivery Form and Amendment and Acceptanc

1 #4

Exhibit D (Death Certificate)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) NOTICE Original Filing Form: by Plaintiff Principal National Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,, (Kersting, Edna) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C (EFT Form)

1 #5

Exhibit E (Attorney Letter June 10, 2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Principal National Life Insurance Company Donna T. Rothenberg waiver signed on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Kersting, Edna) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for declaratory judgment and relief against defendant Donna T. Rothenberg with receipt number AMOEDC-7402538, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Principal National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Policy), #2 Exhibit B (Agreement and Acceptance of Delivery Form and Amendment and Acceptance Form), #3 Exhibit C (EFT Form), #4 Exhibit D (Death Certificate), #5 Exhibit E (Attorney Letter June 10, 2019), #6 Exhibit F (Response June 24, 2019), #7 Exhibit G (July 29, 2019 letter), #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kersting, Edna) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Principal National Life Insurance Company.. (Kersting, Edna) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit G (July 29, 2019 letter)

1 #1

Exhibit A (Policy)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Principal National Life Insurance Company Donna T. Rothenberg waiver signed on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Kersting, Edna) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE Lawsuit: by Plaintiff Principal National Life Insurance Company (Kersting, Edna) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER of Service issued defendantDonna T. Rothenberg. sent to Donna T. Rothenberg on 08/20/2019 filed by Principal National Life Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 9/19/2019. (Kersting, Edna) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (MFG) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE Original Filing Form: by Plaintiff Principal National Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,, (Kersting, Edna) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Principal National Life Insurance Company.. (Kersting, Edna) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for declaratory judgment and relief against defendant Donna T. Rothenberg with receipt number AMOEDC-7402538, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Principal National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Policy), #2 Exhibit B (Agreement and Acceptance of Delivery Form and Amendment and Acceptance Form), #3 Exhibit C (EFT Form), #4 Exhibit D (Death Certificate), #5 Exhibit E (Attorney Letter June 10, 2019), #6 Exhibit F (Response June 24, 2019), #7 Exhibit G (July 29, 2019 letter), #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kersting, Edna) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.