This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2019 at 10:28:38 (UTC).

Princeton Community Hospital Association Inc. v. Nuance Communications, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 Princeton Community Hospital Association Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Nuance Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David A. Faber. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00265

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David A. Faber

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc.

Defendant

Nuance Communications, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Larry J. Rector

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

400 White Oaks Boulevard

Bridgeport, WV 26330

Kristin C. Davis

Attorney at THOMPSON HAMMERMAN DAVIS

Suite 600, 1015 15Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Gary Thompson

Attorney at THOMPSON HAMMERMAN DAVIS

Suite 600, 1015 15Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Gretchen M. Callas

Attorney at JACKSON KELLY

P. O. Box 553

Charleston, WV 25322-0553

A. L. Emch

Attorney at JACKSON KELLY

P. O. Box 553

Charleston, WV 25322-0553

William J. Aubel

Attorney at JACKSON KELLY

P. O. Box 553

Charleston, WV 25322

Jennifer B. Seale

Attorney at BAKER & MCKENZIE

815 Washington Avenue, Nw

Washinton, DC 20006

John W. Woods

Attorney at BAKER & MCKENZIE

815 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washinton, DC 20006

David C. Lashway

Attorney at BAKER & MCKENZIE

815 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washinton, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

16 #1

Internet Materials

#16

#15

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 1, Part 3

1 #2

Exhibit 1, Part 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1, Part 1

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for all parties to file Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Nuance Communications, Inc., Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc. (Emch, A.) (Modified on 7/6/2019 to add party filer) (ts).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed the Rule 26(f) Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 6/26/2019 is CANCELLED. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 6/20/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (mk)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) JOINT MOTION by Nuance Communications, Inc., Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc. to Stay Proceedings (Emch, A.) (Modified on 6/22/2019 to add party filer) (ts).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Nuance Communications, Inc., Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc. (Emch, A.) (Modified on 6/22/2019 to add party filer) (ts).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY by Nuance Communications, Inc. to #16 Brief In Opposition. (Emch, A.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY by Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc. to #16 Response in Opposition. (Rector, Larry) (Modified on 6/3/2019 to correct link to #6 response) (ts).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) OPPOSITION by Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc. in opposition to #8 MOTION by Nuance Communications, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint (Attachment: #1 Internet Materials)(Rector, Larry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE by Nuance Communications, Inc. in opposition to #6 MOTION by Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc. to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mercer County (Emch, A.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Kristin C. Davis on behalf of Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc. Local counsel: Larry J. Rector. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7246100. (Rector, Larry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Gary Thompson on behalf of Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc. Local counsel: Larry J. Rector. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7246078. (Rector, Larry)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Nuance Communications, Inc. in support of #8 MOTION by Nuance Communications, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal (Emch, A.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Nuance Communications, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Emch, A.) (Modified on 5/15/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal)(ts).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM by Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc. in support of #6 MOTION by Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc. to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mercer County (Rector, Larry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Princeton Community Hospital Association, Inc. to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mercer County (Rector, Larry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from John Woods on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc. Local counsel: A. L. Emch. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7168840. (Emch, A.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Jennifer Seale on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc. Local counsel: A. L. Emch. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7168828. (Emch, A.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from David Lashway on behalf of Nuance Communications, Inc. Local counsel: A. L. Emch. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7168815. (Emch, A.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nuance Communications, Inc. with summons, complaint, other miscellaneous documents and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Mercer County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7165995. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1, Part 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (arb)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Princeton Community Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases where NUANCE COMMUNICATIONS INC, a Delaware for-profit corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristin C. Davis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larry J. Rector