This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:43:18 (UTC).

Princess Karibo v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Princess Karibo filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00280

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Princess Karibo

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

WKG Fly Shop

hana's shop

shanghongfu0716

wanghaixia7089

Atlantis spolt

zhangtongtong162X

wangmeiying452

zhuyanhong4939

rgfgbgggggf

ALONZO11

vcdfre33

tianxiaojun5285

rongji4717668716

YLANDAYLANDA

guaisoukepi

Peter001

sdltgfkhisdoi

zengliuhao4284

183 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Any defendant wishing to appear and object to plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #25 must enter an appearance on the docket and file an objection by 4/1/2022. (rao, ) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#27

(#27) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to unseal any previously sealed documents in this matter. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 2/24/2022. Mailed notice (aee, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

26 #3

Declaration of Keith A. Vogt

26 #2

Exhibit 2

26 #1

Exhibit 1

#26

(#26) MEMORANDUM by Princess Karibo in support of motion for default judgment #25 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#25

(#25) MOTION by Plaintiff Princess Karibo for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Princess Karibo by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Princess Karibo by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Princess Karibo by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Princess Karibo by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) SCHEDULE A by Plaintiff Princess Karibo Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) Modified on 2/25/2022 (bg, ). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Any defendant wishing to appear and object to plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #25 must enter an appearance on the docket and file an objection by 4/1/2022. (rao, ) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: SunTees, UltraCorez, qinziweiyt, liubo66648, zhaoqi0076, L5L5L56, KKKERR8, feererr66, DWDWE66, Chott and Jay Sukow, KKJJ66, DDWW665, Serita Whittington, BBBRRR8, qqwwq65, K8K8K8, tt8t8t8, Sushi & Teriyaki, ssdd66, RioLeigh Beauty, SSDDS656 and C6C66C6C added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: zhoutian3406, YIJIN53, liweiheng, yuanhao1688, mingtianjiayoua, surprise yan, jimmy33002, luoshudan4283, corpuscare, wangjiaxin23, surprise bing, surprise hong, gaoqipeng3504, surprise qing, surprise young, YIJIN29, luoxing4386, lijuanjuan5904, jianwanchuan4293, YIJIN32, 00IGMO, minhui001, g6g6g8g, mafengqin159357, liuyang7181, ghght543, wutingting6705, kanglongsheng4444, yexiaoxiaer, dqzf97jing, houliangyan66058, linghuchanlin8548, weihongbin7890, niceVIP, lijjianbing25800, menzhiaya, Michelle188, timk, lifeilong39, lihuidong32430, mimilu, Health Beauty Base, xiaojian2736, liuzewang1788, jianghaonanooop, niuliang4664466, Life elves, RichardSchwartz, yanyanyystore, delicate presents, chunchunstore, qingyanph, luossphone, xiewen3428, Terry L Hugill, zongkai6015, homogeneous, oberbrunnerclemmie92, nengxingbb, Xiao Lu World, Livet Reichard Company, Da Xiang fashion, glucosazone and xieqianqianksl added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: sdgfdgawsres44 added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: menghuan841002@163.com, illc241shop, Sunye123, leilongdonxi, jhfioahwui;osaihoisaihgioahsdfg, zhangming520, skdlxm10, James Himes, wangyiyan1314 and wangxiangrong6307 added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: sweeat, Xieting case, xiaoxiaoli store, windfan, zhongju Interesting Gadgets, Excellent Yourself, HongHongLove, Galaxy Man Man, nihen28, alegostore, songguicai123, Cool home, Fangubi, LL_Liang, Panaderiasuprema, mameilizhu, liguijin, jianhuafan, shazhulao, kuoguogongshi, chuili fashion, YIJIN47, surprise xin, PPPabcgg, YIJIN28, lishilei47852, Michael & Cady Store, Mrkitty, Sexy Fun Store, S6D6F6, JJYYUU66, S6S8S9, omyg, dnltd, shenzhen tarico ltd, LUPINGJIANG2501, cineangiography, htqc168, Sanctuaries, Alaonger Bags, Creative Living Commodity Store, simple 10ve, lijiawei55033, LilyCaishop, LotusApparel, huangxueling store, jinzhipeng6982, zhanglijia1213, yangchangyu1234, ResinTemi, Pheasant, Tini Unicorn, merchizone, bikebi, shirtt, jgde, wangbotl and piprintondemand added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: shanghongfu0716, wanghaixia7089, Atlantis spolt, zhangtongtong162X, wangmeiying452, zhuyanhong4939, rgfgbgggggf, ALONZO11, vcdfre33, tianxiaojun5285, rongji4717668716, YLANDAYLANDA, guaisoukepi, Peter001, sdltgfkhisdoi, zengliuhao4284, yutao9706, Naturalapolis, amblychromasia, wangsiqi00564, Bofors, Tiger Industries, shenfeiyaya, surprise yangyang, n3n36, wudanggaoqiu, morloy, liurui97, CAOHAOLOVE, X2X2X6, USFN RBK152, FishCoCo, Explosivo Lu, Aoalygiver Toys, Borgestodo, xiaozhonqing, Don't miss it again, CHENXIANG844, Kawaiii, Xiong Zhuo Network Technology Co., Ltd., HandsomeGir1, Beautiful sunshine Store and Mrs.Queen added to case caption. (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to unseal any previously sealed documents in this matter. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 2/24/2022. Mailed notice (aee, ) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MEMORANDUM by Princess Karibo in support of motion for default judgment #25 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION by Plaintiff Princess Karibo for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiff Princess Karibo for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Princess Karibo by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Princess Karibo by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Princess Karibo by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Princess Karibo by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SCHEDULE A by Plaintiff Princess Karibo Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) Modified on 2/25/2022 (bg, ). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Princess Karibo; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19063325. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Grodman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yi Bu