This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 10:23:08 (UTC).

Princess Karibo v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 Princess Karibo filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Norgle, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00169

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Norgle, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Princess Karibo

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Fashion_Man

Camille & Andrew

Haiweite

Wuxi Yaohui Paper Co., Ltd.

Futurelife Store

quanzhoushikehuanwangluokejiyouxiangongsi

dhgkjhdsglk

Stacy S Easton

ALANGWUJIN

MoMo Art

hhh105shop

Wangzhidianzi

Aile Dcor

Guangzhou Weifuda Trading Co., Ltd.

Ginshinanx

Suqian Juankang Furniture Co., Ltd.

Zhejiang McCann Internet Technology Co., Ltd.

bikini bags

167 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Keith A. Vogt

Attorney at Keith Vogt, Ltd.

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Adam Grodman

Attorney at Jiangip Llc

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yanling Jiang

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Yi Bu

Attorney at JiangIP LLC

33 West Jackson Boulevard, Unit #2W

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorney

Shengmao Mu

Attorney at Whitewood Law Pllc

57 West, 57Th Street, 3Rd And 4Th Floors

New York, NY 10019

Other Attorneys

Yong Chen

Attorney at Liu, Chen & Hoffman Llp

One Penn Plaza, Ste 2508

New York, NY 10119

John T.D. Bathke

Attorney at Phillips & Bathke, P.C.

4541 North Prospect Road, Suite 300A

Peoria Heights, IL 61616

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed #40 for Defendant No. 158 Abrahamm only. Case dismissed as to Defendant No. 158 Abrahamm only, without prejudice, with leave to reinstate within three hundred and sixty-five (365) days if the agreed settlement payment is not received. After three hundred and sixty-five (365) days, or upon receipt of the agreed settlement payment, whichever occurs first, the dismissal is with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own attorneys' fees, costs and expenses. Mailed notice (cp, ) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#40

(#40) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#38

(#38) DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER : Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle on 2/16/2022. Mailed notice. (cp, ) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#37

(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment against the defendants identified in first amended schedule A #33 is granted. Default Judgment Order to enter only against defendants identified in first amended schedule A. Mailed notice. (cp, ) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#36

(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #31 is granted. Defendants to respond to the complaint by 3/14/2022. Mailed notice. (cp, ) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#35

(#35) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aile Dcor by Shengmao Mu (Mu, Shengmao) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#33

(#33) MOTION by Plaintiff Princess Karibo for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#31

(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #31 is granted. Defendants to respond to the complaint by 3/14/2022. Mailed notice. (cp, ) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Princess Karibo by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Princess Karibo by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) SCHEDULE A by Plaintiff Princess Karibo Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) Modified on 1/21/2022 (kl, ). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed #40 for Defendant No. 158 Abrahamm only. Case dismissed as to Defendant No. 158 Abrahamm only, without prejudice, with leave to reinstate within three hundred and sixty-five (365) days if the agreed settlement payment is not received. After three hundred and sixty-five (365) days, or upon receipt of the agreed settlement payment, whichever occurs first, the dismissal is with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own attorneys' fees, costs and expenses. Mailed notice (cp, ) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER : Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle on 2/16/2022. Mailed notice. (cp, ) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment against the defendants identified in first amended schedule A #33 is granted. Default Judgment Order to enter only against defendants identified in first amended schedule A. Mailed notice. (cp, ) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #31 is granted. Defendants to respond to the complaint by 3/14/2022. Mailed notice. (cp, ) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aile Dcor by Shengmao Mu (Mu, Shengmao) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MEMORANDUM by Princess Karibo in support of motion for default judgment #33 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION by Plaintiff Princess Karibo for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiff Princess Karibo for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lw, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, ) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Princess Karibo by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Princess Karibo by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Princess Karibo by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Princess Karibo by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SCHEDULE A by Plaintiff Princess Karibo Schedule A to Complaint #1 (Vogt, Keith) Modified on 1/21/2022 (kl, ). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Princess Karibo; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19044249. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Vogt, Keith) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yong Chen