This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 08:49:58 (UTC).

Prince v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Prince filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel D. Crabtree and Angel D. Mitchell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01286

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel D. Crabtree

Referral Judge

Angel D. Mitchell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carl Edward Prince

Defendant

Shelter Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Jon Omlid

Attorney at DeVaughn James Injury Lawyers

3241 North Toben Street

Wichita, KS 67226

Richard W. James

Attorney at DeVaughn James Injury Lawyers

3241 North Toben Street

Wichita, KS 67226

Defendant Attorney

Michael J. Norton

Attorney at Foulston Siefkin LLP - Wichita

1551 North Waterfront Parkway, Suite 100

Wichita, KS 67206-4466

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company identifying None as corporate parent . (Norton, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company.(Norton, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 11:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 12/30/2020. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 1/13/2021. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 1/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/2/2020. (ht) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#7

(#7) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/16/2020 for Defendant Shelter Mutual Insurance Company to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 11/30/2020. (jk) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#6

(#6) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Norton on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Norton, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

5 #2

Exhibit Shelter Mutual Registration Report

5 #1

Exhibit KS Insurance Dept License Search of Shelter Mutual Insurance

#5

(#5) RESPONSE re #4 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Carl Edward Prince (Attachments: #1 Exhibit KS Insurance Dept License Search of Shelter Mutual Insurance, #2 Exhibit Shelter Mutual Registration Report)(Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff Carl Edward Prince is directed to show cause within 14 days why the court should not dismiss his Complaint (Doc. #1 ) without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 11/16/2020. (mam) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#3

(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company filed by Plaintiff Carl Edward Prince (Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Carl Edward Prince. (Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5294713.), filed by Carl Edward Prince.(Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company identifying None as corporate parent . (Norton, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company.(Norton, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER. On November 16, 2020, the court ordered plaintiff to show cause why the court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction because the Complaint fails to establish that diversity of citizenship exists. Doc. #4 . Plaintiff filed a Response (Doc. #5 ) in a timely fashion. The Response sufficiently establishes the citizenship of defendant in this case. And the court finds that plaintiff now has alleged facts sufficient to establish diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Plaintiff thus has shown good cause why the court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 12/04/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mig) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 11:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 12/30/2020. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 1/13/2021. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 1/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/2/2020. (ht) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/16/2020 for Defendant Shelter Mutual Insurance Company to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 11/30/2020. (jk) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Norton on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Norton, Michael) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE re #4 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Carl Edward Prince (Attachments: #1 Exhibit KS Insurance Dept License Search of Shelter Mutual Insurance, #2 Exhibit Shelter Mutual Registration Report)(Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff Carl Edward Prince is directed to show cause within 14 days why the court should not dismiss his Complaint (Doc. #1 ) without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 11/16/2020. (mam) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company filed by Plaintiff Carl Edward Prince (Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Carl Edward Prince. (Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5294713.), filed by Carl Edward Prince.(Omlid, Christopher) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less