This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/05/2020 at 21:24:07 (UTC).

Prince v. Gearbox Software, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 Prince filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Gearbox Software, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr, H Bruce Guyton and Jon P McCalla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00380

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

Presiding Judges

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Jon P McCalla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Robert C Prince

Defendants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Valve Corporation

Randy Pitchford

Gearbox Publishing, LLC

Gearbox Software, LLC

3Rd Party Defendants, Cross Claimants and Counter Claimants

Apogee Software, Ltd.

Scott Miller

George Broussard

Action Entertainment, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Timothy G Harvey

Attorney at Riley Warnock & Jacobson, PLC

1906 West End Avenue

Nashville, TN 37203

Keane Addison Barger

Attorney at Riley Warnock & Jacobson, PLC

1906 West End Avenue

Nashville, TN 37203

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Gavin W Skok

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP (WA)

1001 Fourth Avenue, Suite 4500

Seattle, WA 98154

Gary C Shockley

211 Commerce Street, Suite 800

Nashville, TN 37201-1800

Byron K. Henry

Attorney at Scheef & Stone, LLP

2600 Network Blvd., Ste 400

Frisco, TX 75034

John M Scannapieco

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz (Nashville)

211 Commerce Street, Suite 800

Nashville, TN 37201-1800

Leslie Sanderson

Attorney at Scheef & Stone, LLP

2600 Network Blvd., Ste 400

Frisco, TX 75034

Laura P Hansen

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP (WA)

1001 Fourth Avenue, Suite 4500

Seattle, WA 98154

Martha L Boyd

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz (Nashville)

211 Commerce Street, Suite 800

Nashville, TN 37201-1800

3Rd Party Defendant, Cross Claimant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

George R Schultz

Attorney at Schultz & Associates

5400 Lbj Freeway, Suite 1200

Dallas, TX 75240

Russell E Stair

Attorney at Bass, Berry & Sims, PLC (Knox)

900 South Gay Street, Suite 1700

Knoxville, TN 37902

Jonathan E Nelson

Attorney at Bass, Berry & Sims, PLC-Memphis

100 Peabody Place, Suite 1300

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

66 #6

Exhibit 6 - 2020.08.03 - Email from K. Barger to B. Henry

66 #5

Exhibit 5 - 2020.07.29 - Email from K. Barger to L. Sanderson

66 #4

Exhibit 4 - 2020.07.13 - Email from K. Barger to L. Sanderson

66 #3

Exhibit 3 - 2020.07.10 - B. Henry to Tim Harvey re Discovery

66 #2

Exhibit 2 - 2020.06.26 - TGH to Henry and Boyd

#66

65 #4

Exhibit 4 - 2020.07.30 - Ltr to Tim Harvey re Pitchford Discovery

65 #3

Exhibit 3 - 2020.07.10 - B. Henry to Tim Harvey re Discovery

65 #1

Exhibit 1 - 2020.06.08 - Pitchford's Resp to P's ROGS RFP & RFA

#2

1 #7

Other Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a C

1 #6

Other Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs

1 #5

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons Gearbox Publishing, LLC

1 #3

Summons Gearbox Software, LLC

1 #2

Summons Randy Pitchford

1 #1

Summons Valve Corporation

#1

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) MOTION to Compel Defendants Gearbox Software, L.L.C. and Gearbox Publishing, LLC by Robert C Prince. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2020.06.08 - Gearbox's Answers to P's 1st ROGS RFP RFA, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2020.06.26 - TGH to Henry and Boyd, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2020.07.10 - B. Henry to Tim Harvey re Discovery, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2020.07.13 - Email from K. Barger to L. Sanderson, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2020.07.29 - Email from K. Barger to L. Sanderson, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2020.08.03 - Email from K. Barger to B. Henry)(Barger, Keane) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) MOTION to Compel Defendant Randy Pitchford by Robert C Prince. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2020.06.08 - Pitchford's Resp to P's ROGS RFP & RFA, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2020.06.26 - TGH to Henry and Boyd, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2020.07.10 - B. Henry to Tim Harvey re Discovery, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2020.07.30 - Ltr to Tim Harvey re Pitchford Discovery, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2020.08.03 - Email from K. Barger to B. Henry)(Barger, Keane) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) ANSWER to #55 Defendant Gearbox Software, L.L.C.'s First Amended Third-Party Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Robert C Prince, and COUNTERCLAIM against Gearbox Software, LLC by George Broussard, Scott Miller, Action Entertainment, Inc., Apogee Software, Ltd. (Nelson, Jonathan) Modified text on 7/30/2020 (AYB). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Action Entertainment, Inc., Apogee Software, Ltd.. (Nelson, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE.Signed by District Judge Jon P McCalla on 7/23/20. (AAC) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Jon P McCalla: Scheduling Conference held on 7/23/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 7/23/2020. Keane Barger appeared for the Plaintiff. Bryon Henry, Leslie Sanderson, Martha Boyd, Gavin Skok, George Schultz, Jonathan Nelson, and Russell Stair appeared for the Defendants. Court heard final arguments on Pitchford's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 14) on the grounds of personal jurisdiction. Court will deny the motion at this time. Motion to Dismiss as to Mr. Pitchford may be renewed after further additional discovery. Court reviewed asserted facts in the case. Court conducted discussions as to the need for schedule amendments since addition of third-party defendants. Schedule amendments made except as to the trial date, pretrial conference, and pretrial order, which remain unchanged. An Amended Scheduling Order will be entered. (Court Reporter Korian Neal, Alpha Reporting) (KMK) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Notice of Attorney John M Scannapieco Withdrawal. (Boyd, Martha) Modified text on 7/16/2020 (AYB). (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference reset from 7/20/2020 to 7/23/2020 at 9:30 AM CT / 10:30 AM ET before District Judge Jon P McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. PLEASE REVIEW THE ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS.(KMK) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 2:00 PM CT / 3:00 PM ET before District Judge Jon P McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. PLEASE REVIEW THE ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS.(KMK) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • Docket(#58) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by District Judge Jon P McCalla on 7/9/20. (AAC) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert C Prince. Gearbox Publishing, LLC served on 1/17/2020. (ABF) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Summonses. The United States Marshals Office SHALL serve Defendants on or before January 24, 2020. Counsel for Plaintiff shall provide the United States Marshals Office with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 1/06/2020. (KMK) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Summonses by Robert C Prince. (Harvey, Timothy) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE re IFP Service (ABF) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Gearbox Publishing, LLC, Gearbox Software, LLC, Randy Pitchford, Valve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons Gearbox Software LLC, #2 Summons Randy Pitchford, #3 Summons Valve Corporation)(ABF) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that the clerk issue summons and the United States Marshal, or the plaintiff, shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon all defendant(s) as directed by the plaintiff. If the United States Marshal provides the service, all costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. If the plaintiff provides his/her own service, the plaintiff will bear their own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 10/4/19. (ABF) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert C Prince. (Harvey, Timothy) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (ABF) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Administrative Notice to Counsel Timothy Harvey re #1 Complaint : Requirements due by 10/2/2019. Please use the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non Prisoner) located under forms on our website. The application must be filed separately from the complaint as a "Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis" located under the motions category. Please correct and refile in order to process the complaint(ABF) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert C Prince. (Attachments: #1 Summons Valve Corporation, #2 Summons Randy Pitchford, #3 Summons Gearbox Software, LLC, #4 Summons Gearbox Publishing, LLC, #5 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Other Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #7 Other Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright)(Harvey, Timothy) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gearbox Software, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Valve Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell E Stair