Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2021 at 08:03:52 (UTC).

Prince v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 Prince filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristi H. Johnson and Michael T. Parker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00317

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristi H. Johnson

Referral Judge

Michael T. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James D Prince

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arati C Furness

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Matthew Ryan McCarley

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Kelly L. *Chermack-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Attorney at FEARS NACHAWATI, PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B North, Jr

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC - Atlanta, GA

201 17Th St. Nw, Ste. 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Elizabeth Ross Hadley

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP - Austin

300 West 6Th Street, Suite 2050

Austin, TX 78701

J. Carter Thompson, Jr.

Attorney at BAKER, DONELSON, BEARMAN, CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ, PC - Jackson

One Eastover Center, 100 Vision Drive, Suite 400

Jackson, MS 39211

Richard B. *North-TRANSFER ATTORNEY, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLC - Atlanta

201 17Th St. Nw, Ste. 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR EXEMPTION FROM LOCAL RULE 83.1(D)(3) by James D Prince (Chermack - PHV, Kelly) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Carter Thompson, Jr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Thompson, J.) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 18, 2021. (js) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney [Defs' Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Following Remand] by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ross Hadley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#6

(#6) Letter(s) sent to attorney(s) Furness, McCarley and North requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee in our Transfer Case Number 3:21cv317-KHJ-MTP. (VM) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-03199. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 5/10/2021 (VM). (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#4

(#4) AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#3

(#3) *AMENDED by Doc. #4 --FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16048558 filed by James D Prince. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.] (Entered: 10/09/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER denying #11 Motion for Exemption for Local Rules; denying #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. In #11 Motion, Plaintiff requests that his non-resident attorney be allowed to appear pro hac vice without associating a resident attorney as required by Local Rule 83.1(d)(3). The Court denies this request. As a resident attorney has not been associated as required by Local Rule 83.1(d)(3), the Court denies #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice without prejudice to attorney's right to seek admission in accordance with the rules of this Court. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 11, 2021. (js) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Kelly Chermack to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4559001) by James D Prince (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing District of Colorado, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Spreme Court of Texas, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing District of Columbia)(Chermack - PHV, Kelly) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR EXEMPTION FROM LOCAL RULE 83.1(D)(3) by James D Prince (Chermack - PHV, Kelly) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Carter Thompson, Jr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Thompson, J.) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 18, 2021. (js) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney [Defs' Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Following Remand] by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ross Hadley on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Hadley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter(s) sent to attorney(s) Furness, McCarley and North requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee in our Transfer Case Number 3:21cv317-KHJ-MTP. (VM) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-03199. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 5/10/2021 (VM). (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Southern District of Mississippi via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.] (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *AMENDED by Doc. #4 --FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.] (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-03199-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.] (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16048558 filed by James D Prince. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/10/2021.] (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly L. Chermack

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arati Furness