This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2021 at 10:00:51 (UTC).

Prince Telecom, LLC v. Total Quality Assurance Cable Specialists, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Prince Telecom, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Total Quality Assurance Cable Specialists, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nanette K. Laughrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04125

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nanette K. Laughrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Prince Telecom, LLC

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Navigators Insurance Company

Total Quality Assurance Cable Specialists, Inc.

Eagle Fibercommunications, LLC doing business as Fiber Solutions, LLC

Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant

Eagle Fibercommunications, LLC doing business as Fiber Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carl J. Lumley

Attorney at Curtis, Heinz, Garrett & O'Keefe, P.C.

130 South Bemiston, Suite 200

Clayton, MO 63105

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel E. Tranen

Attorney at Wilson Elser

101 West Vandalia Street, Suite 220

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Jesse Jones Gray

Attorney at Brown & James, PC-St.Louis

800 Market Street, Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Paul F Devine

Attorney at Boggs, Avellino, Lach & Boggs, LLC

9326 Olive Boulevard, Suite 200, Sixth Floor

Saint Louis, MO 63132

Beth C. Boggs

Attorney at Boggs, Avellino, Lach & Boggs, LLC

9326 Olive Boulevard, Suite 200

St. Louis, MO 63132

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) Joint MOTION for extension of time for Mediation filed by Paul F Devine on behalf of Total Quality Assurance Cable Specialists, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Paul F Devine added to party Total Quality Assurance Cable Specialists, Inc.(pty:dft))(Devine, Paul) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#25

(#25) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Eagle Fibercommunications, LLC d/b/a Fiber Solutions, LLC Service due by 10/25/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Devine, Paul) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#24

(#24) ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint on behalf of Total Quality Assurance Cable Specialists, Inc..(Boggs, Beth) Modified on 7/27/2021 to correct docket text (Lock, Tania). (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#23

(#23) ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint on behalf of Navigators Insurance Company.(Gray, Jesse) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#22

(#22) DESIGNATION of Mediator by Prince Telecom, LLC. (Lumley, Carl) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#21

(#21) RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 07/20/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

20 #1

Memo on PTC

#20

(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/29/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Jury Trial set for 9/19/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Dispositive Motions due by 5/20/2022. Signed on 07/20/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#13

(#23) ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint on behalf of Navigators Insurance Company.(Gray, Jesse) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

5 #1

MAP General Order

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#4

(#4) Proposed scheduling order due by 7/16/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 7/9/2021. Signed on 06/25/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 06/25/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Defendant Navigators Insurance Company filed by Daniel E. Tranen on behalf of Defendant Navigators Insurance Company.(Tranen, Daniel) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cole County, case number 21AC-CC00174, filed by Daniel E. Tranen. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7470664. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tranen, Daniel) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Eagle Fibercommunications, LLC. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. The parties' joint motion (Doc. #26 ) to extend mediation-related deadlines is DENIED in accordance with Section V.C. of the General Order of the Western District of Missouri regarding the Mediation and Assessment Program. Requests for extension of mediation deadline must be made in accordance with that General Order. Signed on August 2, 2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Sreeprakash, Netra) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Joint MOTION for extension of time for Mediation filed by Paul F Devine on behalf of Total Quality Assurance Cable Specialists, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/16/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Paul F Devine added to party Total Quality Assurance Cable Specialists, Inc.(pty:dft))(Devine, Paul) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Eagle Fibercommunications, LLC d/b/a Fiber Solutions, LLC Service due by 10/25/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Devine, Paul) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint on behalf of Total Quality Assurance Cable Specialists, Inc..(Boggs, Beth) Modified on 7/27/2021 to correct docket text (Lock, Tania). (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint on behalf of Navigators Insurance Company.(Gray, Jesse) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) DESIGNATION of Mediator by Prince Telecom, LLC. (Lumley, Carl) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 07/20/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/29/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Jury Trial set for 9/19/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Dispositive Motions due by 5/20/2022. Signed on 07/20/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Rule 26 Disclosures by Prince Telecom, LLC (Lumley, Carl) Modified on 7/20/2021 to reflect correct document event (Warren, Melissa). (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for extension of time to file its Responsive Pleading filed by Jesse Jones Gray on behalf of Navigators Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/14/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Gray, Jesse) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket(#7) ORDER by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Consent motion by defendant Total Quality Assurance Cable Specialists, Inc. for a 30-day extension of its time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is GRANTED. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Sreeprakash, Netra) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for extension of time to file answer. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/9/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for extension of time to file answer and entry of appearance by Beth C. Boggs on behalf of Total Quality Assurance Cable Specialists, Inc. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/9/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court (Boggs, Beth). Modified on 6/28/2021 to reflect motion entry and set deadlines (Warren, Melissa). (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed scheduling order due by 7/16/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 7/9/2021. Signed on 06/25/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 06/25/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Defendant Navigators Insurance Company filed by Daniel E. Tranen on behalf of Defendant Navigators Insurance Company.(Tranen, Daniel) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cole County, case number 21AC-CC00174, filed by Daniel E. Tranen. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7470664. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tranen, Daniel) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prince Telecom, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carl J. Lumley