This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:08:15 (UTC).

Primus Networks Inc. v. Surna Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Primus Networks Inc filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Surna Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04517

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Primus Networks Inc.

Defendant

Surna Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lee L Kaplan

Attorney at Smyser Kaplan & Veselka

717 Louisiana Avenue, Suite 2800

Houston, TX 77002-2761

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen H Lee

Attorney at Porter Hedges LLP

1000 Main Street, 36Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Adam Massaro

Attorney at Lewis Roca

1200 17Th Street, Suite 3000

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Surna Inc., filed.(Lee, Stephen) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Surna Inc., filed.(Lee, Stephen) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Primus Networks Inc., filed.(Kaplan, Lee) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition is extended to Monday, December 9, 2019.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Adam Massaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

4 #1

Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Surna Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Lee, Stephen) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Adam Massaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Surna Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/12/2019. (Lee, Stephen) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2019-77394 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23582234) filed by Surna Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lee, Stephen) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Surna Inc., filed.(Lee, Stephen) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Surna Inc., filed.(Lee, Stephen) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Primus Networks Inc., filed.(Kaplan, Lee) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition is extended to Monday, December 9, 2019.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Adam Massaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Surna Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Lee, Stephen) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Adam Massaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Surna Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/12/2019. (Lee, Stephen) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2019-77394 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23582234) filed by Surna Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lee, Stephen) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less