This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/13/2019 at 07:35:44 (UTC).

Primerica Financial Services, LLC et al v. Earley

Case Summary

On 02/12/2019 Primerica Financial Services, LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Earley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Leigh Martin May. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00735

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Andrew Chiang

Arturo Martinez

Primerica Financial Services, LLC

Rachel Martinez

Defendant

Billy Earley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter S. Fruin

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Suite 2400, Regions Harbert Plaza

Birmingham, AL 35203

Starr Drum

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale -AL

1901 Sixth Avenue North, 2400 Amsouth/Harbert Plaza

Birmingham, AL 35203-2602

Brett Allan Rogers

Attorney at Rogers & Hardin, LLP

2700 International Tower, Peachtree Center, 229 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303-1601

Rachel Mary Bishop

Attorney at Rogers & Hardin, LLP

2700 International Tower, Peachtree Center, 229 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303-1601

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit -A

1 #2

Exhibit -B

1 #3

Exhibit -C

1 #4

Exhibit -D

1 #5

Exhibit -E

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

#7

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (btql) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (btql) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Andrew Chiang, Arturo Martinez, Rachel Martinez, Primerica Financial Services, LLC (Bishop, Rachel) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Stay and Scheduling Order. Respondent shall file his written response to the Petition, if necessary, on or by May 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/26/2019. (btql) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION to Stay and Scheduling Order by Primerica Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Brett) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/14/2019. (btql) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Andrew Chiang, Arturo Martinez, Rachel Martinez and Primerica Financial Services, LLC identifying Other Affiliate, Primerica, Inc. for Primerica Financial Services, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Billy Earley. (eop) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION to Compel Arbitration and for Injunction to Stay Improper Court Action filed by Arturo Martinez, Primerica Financial Services, LLC, Andrew Chiang and Rachel Martinez. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8445969) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Primerica Financial Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Sean Fruin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Starr Drum