This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 09:30:55 (UTC).

Prime Insurance Company v. Turner

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Prime Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Turner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis van Meerveld and Eldon E. Fallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02859

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

Presiding Judge

Eldon E. Fallon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Prime Insurance Company

Defendants

RASHAD TURNER

New Orleans, LA 70115

Joseph Williams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Ashley Meeks

Attorney at Christopher Meeks

701 Poydras Street, 40Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70139

John F. McCormick, III

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St. Suite 4040, 40Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Rashad Turner served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Meeks, Christopher) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#10

(#10) ERROR: DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DOCUMENT 11. SUMMONS Returned Executed; (Meeks, Christopher) Modified text on 12/4/2020 (bm). (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#9

(#9) **DEFICIENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed; Rashad Turner served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Meeks, Christopher) Modified on 12/3/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rashad Turner, Joseph Williams filed by Prime Insurance Company.(jeg) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/16/2020. (jeg) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #1

Proposed Pleading

#6

(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Prime Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Meeks, Christopher) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Rashad Turner. (jeg) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Meeks, Christopher) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Rashad Turner (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8555347) filed by Prime Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Christopher Ashley Meeks added to party Prime Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Meeks, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/21/2020) (jeg). Modified text on 10/21/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Summons Returned Executed. This is a duplicate filing of document 11 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary. (bm) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Rashad Turner served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Meeks, Christopher) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ERROR: DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DOCUMENT 11. SUMMONS Returned Executed; (Meeks, Christopher) Modified text on 12/4/2020 (bm). (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **DEFICIENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed; Rashad Turner served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Meeks, Christopher) Modified on 12/3/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rashad Turner, Joseph Williams filed by Prime Insurance Company.(jeg) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/16/2020. (jeg) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Prime Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Meeks, Christopher) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Rashad Turner. (jeg) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Submitted for Issuance (Meeks, Christopher) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Rashad Turner (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8555347) filed by Prime Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Christopher Ashley Meeks added to party Prime Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Meeks, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/21/2020) (jeg). Modified text on 10/21/2020 (jeg). (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prime Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A Meeks

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F. McCormick III