This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2019 at 07:20:36 (UTC).

Primary Residential Mortgage Inc. et al. v. Elizabeth Thomas et al. DO NOT DOCKET. CASE HAS BEEN REMANDED.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 Primary Residential Mortgage Inc filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Elizabeth Thomas DO NOT DOCKET CASE HAS BEEN REMANDED. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00559

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, 3Rd Party Defendants and Appellees

Primary Residential Mortgage Inc.

Meritage Homes Of Texas LLC.

McCarthy&HolthusLLP

Appellant and Defendant

ELIZABETH THOMAS

Defendants

Robert L Thomas

James Allen

ELIZABETH THOMAS

Appellees and 3Rd Party Defendants

MICHAEL PIZZITOLA

Primary Residential Mortgage Inc.

MICHAEL MATERNA

RODNEY B HOWERTON

DAVID JORDAN

KEVIN MEUTH

DAVID MODLIN

MELISSA HANNA

MERITAGE HOMES OF TEXAS LLC

JEFF BARFIELD

CHRIS HUEBNER

STEWART TITLE COMPANY

MARY A LESTER

MTH LENDING GROUP LP

MERITAGE HOMES CORPORATION

3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Defendants

James Allen

McCarthy&HolthusLLP

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, 3Rd Party Defendant and Appellee Attorneys

Jennifer Nicole Chang

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

One Riverway, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77056

Andrew T McKinney, IV

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

One Riverway, Ste 1000

Houston, TX 77056

Kimberly G Altsuler

Attorney at Coats Rose Yale et al

9 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77046

Barry Stephen Rabon

Attorney at Coats Rose et al

9 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77046

Scott Masur McElhaney

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

2323 Ross Ave, Ste 600

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Colleen Michele McClure

4201 Cypress Creek Parkway Suite 565

Houston, TX 77068

Other Attorneys

Thomas H Smith, III

Attorney at Roger G. Jain & Associates, P.C.

9301 Southwest Freeway, Suite 250

Houston, TX 77074

Dale Marett Holidy

Attorney at Germer LLP

2929 Allen Parkway, Suite 2900

Houston, TX 77019

 

Court Documents

39 #2

Exhibit B

39 #1

Exhibit A

#39

(#39) LETTERTOCLERKOFCOURT FOR CERTIFIED MAILING OF ORDER by James Allen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#37

(#37) ORDER of Sanctions and Preclusion(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#36

(#36) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Remand; granting #15 Motion to Remand. Plaintiff's shall recover attorneys' fees in the amount of $3,318.00 from Defendant jointly and severally, for which let execution issue. This case is remanded to the 127th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

15 #1

Exhibit A (state court notice)

#15

(#36) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Remand; granting #15 Motion to Remand. Plaintiff's shall recover attorneys' fees in the amount of $3,318.00 from Defendant jointly and severally, for which let execution issue. This case is remanded to the 127th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

11 #6

Proposed Order Proposed Order

11 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Robert L Thomas, filed.(McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

2 #1

Proposed Order

#2

(#2) NOTICE OFRELATEDCASEMOTIONTOTRANSFER by Robert L Thomas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#9) NOTICE Amended Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal by James Allen, filed. (McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

145 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) LETTERTOCLERKOFCOURT FOR CERTIFIED MAILING OF ORDER by James Allen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER of Sanctions and Preclusion(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Remand; granting #15 Motion to Remand. Plaintiff's shall recover attorneys' fees in the amount of $3,318.00 from Defendant jointly and severally, for which let execution issue. This case is remanded to the 127th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Summons Issued as to McCarthy&HolthusLLP. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) REPLY to Response to #29 Opposed MOTION for Clarification, filed by Robert L Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Robert L Thomas, filed.(McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed by James Allen.(McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) RESPONSE in Opposition to #29 Opposed MOTION for Clarification, filed by Meritage Homes Of Texas LLC., Primary Residential Mortgage Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal filed in State Court Case No. 2017-76078)(McKinney, Andrew) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE of Appearance by Roger G. Jain and Thomas H. Smith III on behalf of Maria Perez, filed. (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Opposed MOTION for Clarification by James Allen, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Judge's Procedures)(McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/24/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE Amended Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal by James Allen, filed. (McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Transfer. Case reassigned to Judge David Hittner for the following reason: Related to case H-18-cv--0851 and agreement between the judges. Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (leddins, 4) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Opposed EMERGENCY MOTION( Motion Docket Date 3/13/2019.), MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Robert L Thomas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit I-A, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Proposed Order)(McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Opposed EMERGENCY MOTION( Motion Docket Date 3/13/2019.), MOTION to Alter Judgment by James Allen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Proposed Order)(McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OFUNCONSOLIDATED CASE re: #1 Notice of Removal by MICHAEL PIZZITOLA, KEVIN MEUTH, DAVID JORDAN, RODNEY B HOWERTON, DAVID MODLIN, JEFF BARFIELD, MICHAEL MATERNA, CHRIS HUEBNER, MELISSA HANNA, ELIZABETH THOMAS, filed. (McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OFUNCONSOLIDATED CASE re: #1 Notice of Removal by ELIZABETH THOMAS, MERITAGE HOMES CORPORATION, MERITAGE HOMES OF TEXAS LLC, MTH LENDING GROUP LP, PRIMARY RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE INC., STEWART TITLE COMPANY, MARY A LESTER, filed. (McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Robert L Thomas, filed.(McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OFRELATEDCASEMOTIONTOTRANSFER by Robert L Thomas, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 127th Judicial District court, case number 2018-91506 () filed by Elizabeth Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(McClure, Colleen) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.