This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2021 at 10:10:04 (UTC).

Prim v. Illinois DCFS et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Prim filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Illinois DCFS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Embry J. Kidd and Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00360

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jessica Prim

Peoria, IL 61614

Defendants

Family Care (Illinois)

Illinois Inspector General

Illinois DCFS

Peoria Legislators District 17 & 19

Peoria Courthouse

Peoria Police

Illinois State Police

Governor Pritzer

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER adopting #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Jessica Prim, #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency filed by Jessica Prim. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/17/2021. (BIA) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#5

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. I respectfully recommend that the Court dismiss #1 Plaintiff's Complaint, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1406(a). Alternatively, "in the interest of justice," I recommend that the Court transfer this action to the Central District of Illinois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/25/2021. (JLE) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#4

(#4) PRO SE ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/24/2021. (BIA)(CTP) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#3

(#3) INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/24/2021. (BIA)(ctp) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Jessica Prim. (KNC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jessica Prim.(KNC) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER adopting #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Jessica Prim, #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency filed by Jessica Prim. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/17/2021. (BIA) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. I respectfully recommend that the Court dismiss #1 Plaintiff's Complaint, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1406(a). Alternatively, "in the interest of justice," I recommend that the Court transfer this action to the Central District of Illinois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/25/2021. (JLE) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRO SE ORDER. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/24/2021. (BIA)(CTP) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/24/2021. (BIA)(ctp) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Jessica Prim. (KNC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jessica Prim.(KNC) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peoria Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases where Illinois State Police Master Sergeant is a litigant