This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:34:37 (UTC).

PRIEGEL et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 PRIEGEL filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T KENT WETHERELL II and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00005

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T KENT WETHERELL II

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lyn S Priegel

Gerald E Priegel

Defendant

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAURENCE MOSKOWITZ

Attorney at LARRY MOSKOWITZ PA - FORT LAUDERDALE FL

400 Se 9Th Street

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Defendant Attorney

RAMY PABLO ELMASRI

Attorney at CLAUSEN MILLER PC - TAMPA FL

4830 W Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 600

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant's #6 motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, motion to abate is DENIED. Defendant shall have 14 days from the date of this Order to answer the complaint. (Answer due by 3/9/2020.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 2/24/2020. (mb) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

10 #5

Exhibit EXHIBIT E

10 #4

Exhibit EXHIBIT D

10 #3

Exhibit EXHIBIT C

10 #2

Exhibit EXHIBIT B

10 #1

Exhibit EXHIBIT A

#10

(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Abate the Action for Failure to Comply with Conditions Precedent for Bringing Suit filed by GERALD E PRIEGEL, LYN S PRIEGEL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E) (MOSKOWITZ, LAURENCE) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by LAURENCE MOSKOWITZ on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MOSKOWITZ, LAURENCE) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#8

(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to GERALD E. PRIEGEL and LYN S. PRIEGEL Re: #7 ORDER. (return to sender, unable to forward) (sdw) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO MOTION - Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file a response to the #6 motion to dismiss and explain why the motion should not be granted. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to both Mr. Moskowitz (400 SE 9th Street, Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33316) and Plaintiffs (3857 Cape San Blas Road, Port St. Joe, FL 32456). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 2/3/2020. (Order sent to both addresses as instructed). (mb) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

6 #7

Exhibit G

6 #6

Exhibit F

6 #5

Exhibit E

6 #4

Exhibit D

6 #3

Exhibit C

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Abate the Action for Failure to Comply with Conditions Precedent for Bringing Suit by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/30/2020). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (ELMASRI, RAMY) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant's #6 motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, motion to abate is DENIED. Defendant shall have 14 days from the date of this Order to answer the complaint. (Answer due by 3/9/2020.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 2/24/2020. (mb) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #10 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Abate the Action for Failure to Comply with Conditions Precedent for Bringing Suit filed by GERALD E PRIEGEL, LYN S PRIEGEL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, # 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E) (mb) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Abate the Action for Failure to Comply with Conditions Precedent for Bringing Suit filed by GERALD E PRIEGEL, LYN S PRIEGEL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT E) (MOSKOWITZ, LAURENCE) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by LAURENCE MOSKOWITZ on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MOSKOWITZ, LAURENCE) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to GERALD E. PRIEGEL and LYN S. PRIEGEL Re: #7 ORDER. (return to sender, unable to forward) (sdw) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines re #7 ORDER. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to MOTION not filed earlier: 2/17/2020). (mb) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO MOTION - Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file a response to the #6 motion to dismiss and explain why the motion should not be granted. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to both Mr. Moskowitz (400 SE 9th Street, Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33316) and Plaintiffs (3857 Cape San Blas Road, Port St. Joe, FL 32456). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 2/3/2020. (Order sent to both addresses as instructed). (mb) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Abate the Action for Failure to Comply with Conditions Precedent for Bringing Suit (Responses not filed). (mb) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Abate the Action for Failure to Comply with Conditions Precedent for Bringing Suit by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/30/2020). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (ELMASRI, RAMY) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC, Corporate Parent AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY US INC, Other Affiliate LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY for LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY.. (ELMASRI, RAMY) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#4) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (MB) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT for attorney, LARRY MOSKOWITZ, PA. (MB) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE for attorney LARRY MOSKOWITZ, PA. (MB) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY from Circuit Court of the 14th Judicial Court in and for Gulf County, Florida, case number 2019-336CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4763520.), filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (ELMASRI, RAMY) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less