This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/01/2020 at 09:26:14 (UTC).

PRICE v. STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 PRICE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are LORETTA C. BIGGS and L. PATRICK AULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00908

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LORETTA C. BIGGS

Referral Judge

L. PATRICK AULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLES ELDRIDGE PRICE

Defendant

STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DARRYL T. NABORS

Attorney at CRUMLEY ROBERTS, LLP

2400 Freeman Mill Rd., Ste. 200

Greensboro, NC 27406

Defendant Attorneys

MARK W. BAKKER

Attorney at NEXSEN PRUET, LLC

55 E. Camperdown Way, Ste. 400

Greenville, SC 29601

JAMES T. HEDGEPATH

Attorney at NEXSEN PRUET, LLC

55 E. Camperdown Way, Ste. 400

Greenville, SC 29601

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Documents

1 #2

Corporate Disclosure Statement

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Consent Form

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Appointing CALVIN B. BENNETT, III, as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Kemp, Donita) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketMEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Mediation due by 6/25/2021.(Kemp, Donita) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery shall be placed on a case- management track designated in LR 26.1(a) as Complex. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2021. Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 1/29/2021. Discovery due by 5/19/2021. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 1/15/2021. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 1/29/2021. Mediation due by 6/25/2021. The parties agree that the mediator shall be Cal Bennett. At this time the parties do not consent to the referral of the case to a Magistrate Judge. Trial of the action is expected to take approximately three days. A jury trial has not been demanded. (Taylor, Abby) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER adopting #10 Joint Rule 26(f) Report. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/16/2020. (AULD, L.) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Referred: RE: #10 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by CHARLES ELDRIDGE PRICE. (NABORS, DARRYL) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 11/30/2020 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (HEDGEPATH, JAMES) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHARLES ELDRIDGE PRICE. (NABORS, DARRYL) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney DARRYL T. NABORS on behalf of Plaintiff CHARLES ELDRIDGE PRICE (NABORS, DARRYL) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JAMES T. HEDGEPATH on behalf of Defendant STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2906145.) (HEDGEPATH, JAMES) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (State Court document originally filed in Cabarrus County Superior Court, case number 20CVS2455, issued 8/21/2020 and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by CHARLES ELDRIDGE PRICE. (State Court document originally filed in Cabarrus County Superior Court, case number 20CVS2455, and listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL against CHARLES ELDRIDGE PRICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2904923.), filed by STANDARD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(BAKKER, MARK) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Standard Insurance Co. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark W Bakker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James T Hedgepath