This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2020 at 08:32:37 (UTC).

Price v. Specialized Solution Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Price filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Specialized Solution Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Jonker and Ray Kent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00862

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Jonker

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mona Price

Defendants

Rannya Cobb

Donald Anthony Smiley

Lamont Darnell Cooper, Jr.

Service Gurus Co.

Fairview Mediation Group Inc

Lamar D. Snow

Cassandra Catherine Cooper

Ennis Laverne Jefferson

Walter D. Hargrove

Specialized Solution Services, LLC

Rannya Cobb-Smiley

A Jefferson Association LLC

Owen & James, Co.

Hood & Thompson Associates Inc

Hardy & Associates Inc.

Black Jockey Company

Amber Jenica Jefferson

Dion Tremayne Jefferson

Global Management Acquisition Firm Inc (GA)

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillip C. Rogers

6140 28Th St. Se, Ste. 115

Grand Rapids, MI 49546-6938

Defendant Attorney

Stephen M. Katz

Attorney at The Katz Law Firm LLC

1225 Johnson Ferry Rd., Ste. 125

Marietta, GA 30068-5407

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim

#15

(#15) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants A Jefferson Association LLC, Black Jockey Company, Rannya Cobb, Cassandra Catherine Cooper, Jada Rashawn Cooper, Lamont Darnell Cooper, Jr, Fairview Mediation Group Inc, Global Management Acquisition Firm Inc (GA), Global Management Acquisition Firm, Inc. (NC), Benny H. Hardy, Jr, Hardy & Associates Inc., Walter D. Hargrove, Hood & Thompson Associates Inc, Amber Jenica Jefferson, Dion Tremayne Jefferson, Ennis Laverne Jefferson, Jahaan Abdul McDuffie, Owen & James, Co., Service Gurus Co., Donald Anthony Smiley, Lamar D. Snow, Specialized Solution Services, LLC, Demetrious Eugene Thompson; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim) (Katz, Stephen) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

14 #1

Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#14

(#14) MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by defendants A Jefferson Association LLC, Black Jockey Company, Rannya Cobb, Cassandra Catherine Cooper, Jada Rashawn Cooper, Lamont Darnell Cooper, Jr, Fairview Mediation Group Inc, Global Management Acquisition Firm Inc (GA), Global Management Acquisition Firm, Inc. (NC), Benny H. Hardy, Jr, Hardy & Associates Inc., Walter D. Hargrove, Hood & Thompson Associates Inc, Amber Jenica Jefferson, Dion Tremayne Jefferson, Ennis Laverne Jefferson, Jahaan Abdul McDuffie, Owen & James, Co., Service Gurus Co., Donald Anthony Smiley, Lamar D. Snow, Specialized Solution Services, LLC, Demetrious Eugene Thompson; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Katz, Stephen) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 11/30/2020 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 11/23/2020; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 motion for extension of time; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#11

(#11) JOINT MOTION for extension of time to file answer or other responsive pleadings by plaintiff Mona Price; (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS returned executed; Jada Rashawn Cooper served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS returned executed; Demetrious Eugene Thompson served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS returned executed; Hood & Thompson Associates Inc served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/19/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS returned executed; Global Management Acquisition Firm, Inc. (NC) served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/19/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Owen & James, Co. served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/19/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS returned executed; Specialized Solution Services, LLC served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/19/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants A Jefferson Association LLC, Black Jockey Company, Rannya Cobb, Cassandra Catherine Cooper, Jada Rashawn Cooper, Lamont Darnell Cooper, Jr, Fairview Mediation Group Inc, Global Management Acquisition Firm Inc (GA), Global Management Acquisition Firm, Inc. (NC), Benny H. Hardy, Jr, Hardy & Associates Inc., Walter D. Hargrove, Hood & Thompson Associates Inc, Amber Jenica Jefferson, Dion Tremayne Jefferson, Ennis Laverne Jefferson, Jahaan Abdul McDuffie, Owen & James, Co., Service Gurus Co., Donald Anthony Smiley, Lamar D. Snow, Specialized Solution Services, LLC, Demetrious Eugene Thompson (slk) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (slk) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Mona Price (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants A Jefferson Association LLC, Black Jockey Company, Rannya Cobb, Cassandra Catherine Cooper, Jada Rashawn Cooper, Lamont Darnell Cooper, Jr, Fairview Mediation Group Inc, Global Management Acquisition Firm Inc (GA), Global Management Acquisition Firm, Inc. (NC), Benny H. Hardy, Jr, Hardy & Associates Inc., Walter D. Hargrove, Hood & Thompson Associates Inc, Amber Jenica Jefferson, Dion Tremayne Jefferson, Ennis Laverne Jefferson, Jahaan Abdul McDuffie, Owen & James, Co., Service Gurus Co., Donald Anthony Smiley, Lamar D. Snow, Specialized Solution Services, LLC, Demetrious Eugene Thompson; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim) (Katz, Stephen) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by defendants A Jefferson Association LLC, Black Jockey Company, Rannya Cobb, Cassandra Catherine Cooper, Jada Rashawn Cooper, Lamont Darnell Cooper, Jr, Fairview Mediation Group Inc, Global Management Acquisition Firm Inc (GA), Global Management Acquisition Firm, Inc. (NC), Benny H. Hardy, Jr, Hardy & Associates Inc., Walter D. Hargrove, Hood & Thompson Associates Inc, Amber Jenica Jefferson, Dion Tremayne Jefferson, Ennis Laverne Jefferson, Jahaan Abdul McDuffie, Owen & James, Co., Service Gurus Co., Donald Anthony Smiley, Lamar D. Snow, Specialized Solution Services, LLC, Demetrious Eugene Thompson; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Katz, Stephen) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Stephen M. Katz on behalf of defendants A Jefferson Association LLC, Black Jockey Company, Rannya Cobb, Cassandra Catherine Cooper, Jada Rashawn Cooper, Lamont Darnell Cooper, Jr, Fairview Mediation Group Inc, Global Management Acquisition Firm Inc (GA), Global Management Acquisition Firm, Inc. (NC), Benny H. Hardy, Jr, Hardy & Associates Inc., Walter D. Hargrove, Hood & Thompson Associates Inc, Amber Jenica Jefferson, Dion Tremayne Jefferson, Ennis Laverne Jefferson, Jahaan Abdul McDuffie, Owen & James, Co., Service Gurus Co., Donald Anthony Smiley, Lamar D. Snow, Specialized Solution Services, LLC, Demetrious Eugene Thompson (Katz, Stephen) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 11/30/2020 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 11/23/2020; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 motion for extension of time; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT MOTION for extension of time to file answer or other responsive pleadings by plaintiff Mona Price; (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS returned executed; Jada Rashawn Cooper served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS returned executed; Demetrious Eugene Thompson served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS returned executed; Hood & Thompson Associates Inc served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed; Global Management Acquisition Firm, Inc. (NC) served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Owen & James, Co. served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS returned executed; Specialized Solution Services, LLC served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants A Jefferson Association LLC, Black Jockey Company, Rannya Cobb, Cassandra Catherine Cooper, Jada Rashawn Cooper, Lamont Darnell Cooper, Jr, Fairview Mediation Group Inc, Global Management Acquisition Firm Inc (GA), Global Management Acquisition Firm, Inc. (NC), Benny H. Hardy, Jr, Hardy & Associates Inc., Walter D. Hargrove, Hood & Thompson Associates Inc, Amber Jenica Jefferson, Dion Tremayne Jefferson, Ennis Laverne Jefferson, Jahaan Abdul McDuffie, Owen & James, Co., Service Gurus Co., Donald Anthony Smiley, Lamar D. Snow, Specialized Solution Services, LLC, Demetrious Eugene Thompson (slk) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (slk) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Mona Price in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5653567 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Mona Price (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLOBAL MANAGEMENT ACQUISITION FIRM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillip C. Rogers