This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/08/2022 at 08:05:36 (UTC).

Price v. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 Price filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leigh Martin May. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05071

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moya Price

Defendants

Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.

John Doe

XYZ-1 Corp.

XYZ-2 Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kathleen Opperman

Attorney at Montlick & Associates, PC

17 Executive Park Drivesuite 300

Atlanta, GA 30329

Steven Andrew Suna

Attorney at Zipperman & Suna, LLP

P.O. Box 170028

Atlanta, GA 30317

Defendant Attorneys

Candice Renee Bryant

Attorney at Cruser Mitchell Novitz Sanchez Gaston, & Zimet, LLP

Meridian Ii, Suite 2000275 Scientific Dr., N.W.

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

Joseph Robb Cruser

Attorney at Cruser, Mitchell, Novitz, Sanchez, Gaston & Zimet, LLP

Meridian Ii, Suite 2000275 Scientific Drive

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11452227) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/13/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit -1

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.. Discovery ends on 5/9/2022. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/13/2021)

2 #1

Jury Demand

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate, Blackrock, Inc. for Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc..(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 12/14/2021. (cmd) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Moya Price.(Suna, Steven) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#7

(#7) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.. (Bryant, Candice) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#8

(#8) Initial Disclosures by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc..(Bryant, Candice) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is assigned to an eight (8) month discovery track. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/7/2022. (rjc) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc..(Bryant, Candice) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANT CRACKER BARREL OLD COUNTRY STORE, INC. by Moya Price.(Suna, Steven) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY TO DEFENDANT CRACKER BARREL OLD COUNTRY STORE, INC. by Moya Price.(Suna, Steven) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc..(Bryant, Candice) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This case is assigned to an eight (8) month discovery track. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/7/2022. (rjc) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Disclosures by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc..(Bryant, Candice) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.. (Bryant, Candice) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS by Moya Price.(Suna, Steven) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 12/14/2021. (cmd) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc..(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate, Blackrock, Inc. for Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.. Discovery ends on 5/9/2022. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11452227) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Candice Renee Bryant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Robb Cruser