This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2021 at 08:16:30 (UTC).

Price et al v. Williams et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 Price filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Williams. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nina Y. Wang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02198

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nina Y. Wang

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nathan L. Price

Adam M. Komoroski

Defendants

T. Edward Williams

Francois Peyrot

UNKOWN

Unknown

T. (I) Edward Williams

Peyrot & Associates PC

Peyrot & Associates PC (I)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David A Prado, Sr

Attorney at David A Prado

W279S3248 Townline Rd

Waukesha, WI 53189

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference is hereby GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference is reset for 11/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The Consent Form is due on or before 10/20/2021. The Proposed Scheduling Order is due on or before 10/27/2021. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/28/2021. Text Only Entry(nywlc3, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs Adam M. Komoroski, Nathan L. Price. (Prado, David) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/24/2021. Consent Form due by 9/28/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/5/2021 Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/12/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. (alave, ) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Francois Peyrot, UNKOWN, Unknown, T. Edward Williams (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8019858)Attorney David A Prado, Sr added to party Adam M. Komoroski(pty:pla), Attorney David A Prado, Sr added to party Nathan L. Price(pty:pla), filed by Adam M. Komoroski, Nathan L. Price. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Prado, David) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE UNKOWN HEIRS AT LAW OF LOUIS BLAKEMORE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Alejandro Prado