This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 09:35:48 (UTC).

Price et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Price filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against The Bank of New York Mellon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. Truncale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-00193

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Truncale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Richard Price

Amanda Rushing Price

Defendants

The Bank of New York Mellon

Newrez LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Walter Lewis Edmond McInnis

Attorney at Akerman LLP - Dallas

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 3600

Dallas, TX 75201

Taylor Dominique Hennington

Attorney at Akerman LLP - Dallas

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 3600

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor Dominique Hennington on behalf of Newrez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon (Hennington, Taylor) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING CIVIL ACTION FOR RULE 16 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference on or before November 9, 2020. The case is SET for a Rule 16 Case Management Conference on December 1, 2020 at 2:30 p.m., via telephone. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/22/20. (ljw, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. For effective disposition of cases in the Eastern District of Texas, this Lufkin civil case is hereby transferred from Judge Ron Clark to Judge Michael Truncale. Signed by District Judge Ron Clark on 10/21/20. (ljw, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order

5 #1

Appendix 1-14

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Newrez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1-14, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McInnis, Walter) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#4

(#4) ORIGINAL ANSWER (filed in State Court) to #3 ORIGINAL PETITION (filed in State Court) by Newrez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon.(ljw, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#3

(#3) ORIGINAL PETITION (filed in State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Amanda Rushing Price & Richard Price.(ljw, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Newrez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon (McInnis, Walter) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

1 #9

Exhibit 8 - Polk county appraisal district real property account information

1 #8

Exhibit 7 - List of attorneys

1 #7

Exhibit 6 - Civil cover sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 5 - State court docket sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - Requests for process / citations

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - Temporary restraining order

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' original petition

1 #1

Exhibit Index

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 258th District Court / Polk County, case number CIV33917. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7997796), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' original petition, #3 Exhibit 2 - Temporary restraining order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Requests for process / citations, #5 Exhibit 4 - Defendants' answer, #6 Exhibit 5 - State court docket sheet, #7 Exhibit 6 - Civil cover sheet, #8 Exhibit 7 - List of attorneys, #9 Exhibit 8 - Polk county appraisal district real property account information)(McInnis, Walter) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor Dominique Hennington on behalf of Newrez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon (Hennington, Taylor) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING CIVIL ACTION FOR RULE 16 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference on or before November 9, 2020. The case is SET for a Rule 16 Case Management Conference on December 1, 2020 at 2:30 p.m., via telephone. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/22/20. (ljw, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin no longer assigned to case. (ljw, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. For effective disposition of cases in the Eastern District of Texas, this Lufkin civil case is hereby transferred from Judge Ron Clark to Judge Michael Truncale. Signed by District Judge Ron Clark on 10/21/20. (ljw, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Newrez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1-14, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McInnis, Walter) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORIGINAL ANSWER (filed in State Court) to #3 ORIGINAL PETITION (filed in State Court) by Newrez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon.(ljw, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORIGINAL PETITION (filed in State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Amanda Rushing Price & Richard Price.(ljw, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Newrez LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon (McInnis, Walter) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 258th District Court / Polk County, case number CIV33917. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7997796), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' original petition, #3 Exhibit 2 - Temporary restraining order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Requests for process / citations, #5 Exhibit 4 - Defendants' answer, #6 Exhibit 5 - State court docket sheet, #7 Exhibit 6 - Civil cover sheet, #8 Exhibit 7 - List of attorneys, #9 Exhibit 8 - Polk county appraisal district real property account information)(McInnis, Walter) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less