Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2021 at 07:20:26 (UTC).

Dalvin Price et al v. County of Los Angeles et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 Dalvin Price filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Los Angeles. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02862

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dalvin Price

Petitioner

DOES 1 through 50, inclusive.

Defendants

David Navarette

City of Compton

Edwin Barajas

Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department

County of Los Angeles

Edgar Cuevas

DOES 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emanuel Thomas

Attorney at The Thomas Firm

4017 Long Beach Boulevard

Long Beach, CA 90807

Defendant Attorneys

Jill Williams

Attorney at Carpenter Rothans and Dumont LLP

500 South Grand Avenue 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Emily B Suhr

Attorney at Carpenter Rothans and Dumont LLP

500 South Grand Avenue 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by DEFENDANT County of Los Angeles.(Suhr, Emily) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jill Williams counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Adding Jill Williams as counsel of record for County of Los Angeles for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT County of Los Angeles. (Attorney Jill Williams added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT County of Los Angeles, re Notice (Other) #4 served on April 2, 2021. (Suhr, Emily) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT filed by DEFENDANT County of Los Angeles. (Suhr, Emily) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT County of Los Angeles, (Suhr, Emily) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Suhr, Emily) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by DEFENDANT County of Los Angeles.(Suhr, Emily) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Dalvin Price in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/2/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jill Williams counsel for Defendant County of Los Angeles. Adding Jill Williams as counsel of record for County of Los Angeles for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT County of Los Angeles. (Attorney Jill Williams added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Williams, Jill) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT County of Los Angeles, re Notice (Other) #4 served on April 2, 2021. (Suhr, Emily) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT filed by DEFENDANT County of Los Angeles. (Suhr, Emily) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT County of Los Angeles, (Suhr, Emily) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Suhr, Emily) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV04234 Receipt No: ACACDC-31036472 - Fee: $402, filed by DEFENDANT County of Los Angeles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Emily B Suhr added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Suhr, Emily) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where : LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT TASKFORCE FOR REGIONAL AUTOTHEFT PREVENTION is a litigant