This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2019 at 08:12:15 (UTC).

Price et al v. Bath & Body Works L L C et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 Price filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Bath Body Works L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Karen L Hayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00016

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Karen L Hayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Robbie Price

Ashley Jo Price

Defendants

Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc

Bath & Body Works L L C

Gallagher Bassett Services Inc

L Brands Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey D Guerriero

Attorney at Guerriero & Guerriero

P O Box 4092

Monroe, LA 71211-4092

Bryan Joseph Creekmore

Attorney at Guerriero & Guerriero

P O Box 4092

Monroe, LA 71211-4092

Shonda D LeGrande

Attorney at Guerriero & Guerriero

P O Box 4092

Monroe, LA 71211-4092

Defendant Attorneys

Mark N Bodin

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford (NO)

601 Poydras Ste 1200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Sarah Elizabeth McMillan

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford (NO)

601 Poydras Ste 1200

New Orleans, LA 70130

David S Osterman

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla (NJ)

301 Carnegie Center Dr Ste 200

Princeton, NJ 08540-6587

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of David S Osterman for Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc, Bath & Body Works L L C and L Brands Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 2/12/2019. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

18 #2

Certificate of good standing

18 #1

Proposed order

#18

(#18) MOTION for David S. Osterman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3873805) by Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc, Bath & Body Works L L C, L Brands Inc. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Bodin, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#17

(#17) JUDGMENT granting #15 Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against Gallagher Bassett Services Inc are Dismissed With Prejudice, all parties to bear their own costs. Plaintiffs' claims against remaining Defendants are reserved. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 2/4/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#16

(#16) PROPOSED ORDER re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss by Ashley Jo Price, Robbie Price. (aty,Guerriero, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/1/2019 to edit text & add filer (FinnSld, P). (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#15

(#15) JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Ashley Jo Price, Robbie Price, Gallagher Bassett Services Inc, Bath & Body Works L L C, Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc, L Brands Inc. (aty,Guerriero, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/1/2019 to add filers (FinnSld, P). (Entered: 02/01/2019)

14 #1

Exhibit

#14

(#14) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER entitled "NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b)" re: #4 Removal Order by Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc, Bath & Body Works L L C, Gallagher Bassett Services Inc, L Brands Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Bodin, Mark) Modified on 2/1/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P). (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#7

(#12) SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #7 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Mark N Bodin on behalf of Gallagher Bassett Services Inc. Show Cause Response due by 2/12/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#6

(#7) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #6 Answer to Complaint, sent to Sarah Elizabeth McMillan, Mark N Bodin on behalf of Gallagher Bassett Services Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/28/2019. (crt,FinnSld, P) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc, Bath & Body Works L L C, L Brands Inc.(aty,Bodin, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#4

(#14) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER entitled "NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b)" re: #4 Removal Order by Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc, Bath & Body Works L L C, Gallagher Bassett Services Inc, L Brands Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Bodin, Mark) Modified on 2/1/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P). (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Sarah Elizabeth McMillan, Mark N Bodin on behalf of Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc, Bath & Body Works L L C, L Brands Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/22/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

1 #2

Civil cover sheet

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Petition

#1

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Sarah Elizabeth McMillan, Mark N Bodin on behalf of Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc, Bath & Body Works L L C, L Brands Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/22/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of David S Osterman for Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc, Bath & Body Works L L C and L Brands Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 2/12/2019. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for David S. Osterman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3873805) by Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc, Bath & Body Works L L C, L Brands Inc. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Bodin, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) JUDGMENT granting #15 Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against Gallagher Bassett Services Inc are Dismissed With Prejudice, all parties to bear their own costs. Plaintiffs' claims against remaining Defendants are reserved. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 2/4/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PROPOSED ORDER re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss by Ashley Jo Price, Robbie Price. (aty,Guerriero, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/1/2019 to edit text & add filer (FinnSld, P). (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Ashley Jo Price, Robbie Price, Gallagher Bassett Services Inc, Bath & Body Works L L C, Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc, L Brands Inc. (aty,Guerriero, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/1/2019 to add filers (FinnSld, P). (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER entitled "NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b)" re: #4 Removal Order by Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc, Bath & Body Works L L C, Gallagher Bassett Services Inc, L Brands Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Bodin, Mark) Modified on 2/1/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P). (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gallagher Bassett Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent Arthur J. Gallagher and Co. for Gallagher Bassett Services Inc. (aty,Bodin, Mark) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #7 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Mark N Bodin on behalf of Gallagher Bassett Services Inc. Show Cause Response due by 2/12/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc identifying Corporate Parent L Brands Inc, Corporate Parent Intimate Brands Inc and Bath & Body Works L L C for Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc. (aty,Bodin, Mark) Modified on 1/23/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P). (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bath & Body Works L L C identifying Corporate Parent L Brands Inc, Corporate Parent Retail Store Operations Inc., Corporate Parent Intimate Brands Inc. for Bath & Body Works L L C. (aty,Bodin, Mark) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 3/24/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/15/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #6 Answer to Complaint, sent to Sarah Elizabeth McMillan, Mark N Bodin on behalf of Gallagher Bassett Services Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/28/2019. (crt,FinnSld, P) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Gallagher Bassett Services Inc.(aty,Bodin, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc, Bath & Body Works L L C, L Brands Inc.(aty,Bodin, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REMOVAL ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 1/9/2019. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Sarah Elizabeth McMillan, Mark N Bodin on behalf of Bath & Body Works Brand Management Inc, Bath & Body Works L L C, L Brands Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/22/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:19-cv-0016 from Alexandria Division to Monroe Division. New Case Number 3:19-cv-0016. (crt,Thigpen, M) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC Ouachita Parish, Case Number 18-3936 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3844457) filed by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc., Bath & Body Works Brand Management, Inc., Bath & Body Works, L.L.C., L Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Petition, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Mark N Bodin added to party Bath & Body Works Brand Management, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark N Bodin added to party Bath & Body Works, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark N Bodin added to party Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark N Bodin added to party L Brands, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Bodin, Mark) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.