This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2019 at 08:27:37 (UTC).

Preston v. Mesa Airlines, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 Preston filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against Mesa Airlines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor A. Bolden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01590

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victor A. Bolden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan L Preston

Defendant

Mesa Airlines, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William P. O'Brien

Attorney at Penny Botticello & O'Brien , P.C.

202 West Center Street

Manchester, CT 06040

Gerald S. Sack

Attorney at Law Offices of Gerald S. Sack

836 Farmington Ave., Suite 109

West Hartford, CT 06119

Defendant Attorney

Michael E. Driscoll

Attorney at Brown, Jacobson, Tillinghast, Lahan & King

22 Courthouse Sq., Po Box 391

Norwich, CT 06360-0391

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald S. Sack on behalf of Susan L Preston (Sack, Gerald) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#8

(#8) First MOTION for Extension of Time until December 23, 2019 to file a 26(f) report by Mesa Airlines, Inc.. (Driscoll, Michael) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

7 #1

Removal Standing Order

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Mesa Airlines, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Mesa Airlines, Inc., #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mesa Airlines, Inc., #6 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/9/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#5

(#5) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2019. Discovery due by 4/9/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/14/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/9/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Mesa Airlines, Inc. already filed in state court at time of removal.(Walker, J.) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mesa Airlines, Inc. dba United Express. (Driscoll, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit Pl's Response to Def's Notice to Admit

1 #3

Exhibit Pl's Answers to Interrogatories

1 #2

Exhibit Def's Answer

1 #1

Exhibit Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mesa Airlines, Inc. dba United Express from CT Superior Court, Hartford, case number HHD-CV18-6103880-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BCTDC-5477445, filed by Mesa Airlines, Inc. dba United Express. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Def's Answer, #3 Exhibit Pl's Answers to Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit Pl's Response to Def's Notice to Admit)(Driscoll, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald S. Sack on behalf of Susan L Preston (Sack, Gerald) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/23/2019 (Perez, J.) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time until December 23, 2019 to file a 26(f) report. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/18/2019. (Conde, Djenab) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) First MOTION for Extension of Time until December 23, 2019 to file a 26(f) report by Mesa Airlines, Inc.. (Driscoll, Michael) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Mesa Airlines, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Mesa Airlines, Inc., #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mesa Airlines, Inc., #6 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/9/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2019. Discovery due by 4/9/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/14/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/9/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Walker, J.) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Mesa Airlines, Inc. already filed in state court at time of removal.(Walker, J.) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mesa Airlines, Inc. dba United Express. (Driscoll, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mesa Airlines, Inc. dba United Express from CT Superior Court, Hartford, case number HHD-CV18-6103880-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BCTDC-5477445, filed by Mesa Airlines, Inc. dba United Express. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Def's Answer, #3 Exhibit Pl's Answers to Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit Pl's Response to Def's Notice to Admit)(Driscoll, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.