This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2022 at 06:47:55 (UTC).

Preston v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 Preston filed an Other lawsuit against American Honda Motor Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01777

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Preston

Penelope Turgeon

Defendant

American Honda Motor Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Larry P Smith

Attorney at Smith Marco

Suite 1200, 55 West Monroe St

Chicago, IL 60603

Stephanie R Tatar

Attorney at Tatar Law Firm, APC

3333 Warrenville Road, Suite 200

Lisle, IL 60532

Stacy M Bardo

Attorney at Bardo Law PC

22 West Washington Street Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60602

Stacy Michelle Bardo

Attorney at Bardo Law, P.C.

22 West Washington Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Michael L. Mallow

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Darlene M. Cho

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Livia M. Kiser

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

633 W. Fifth Street, Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mark D. Campbell

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Riley C. Mendoza

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

111 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 5100

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#26

No Description Available

#107

(#107) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/28/2022.(jh, ) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#106

(#106) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Joint motion by Defendant American Honda Motor Company, Inc. for extension of time to 5/27/22 for Defendant to Respond to Second Amended Complaint #104 is granted. Parties shall email the Court by 6/10/22 to report on the status of the reassignment. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#105

(#105) NOTICE of Motion by Riley C. Mendoza for presentment of extension of time #104 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/27/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Mendoza, Riley) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

104 #1

Text of Proposed Order

104 #104

Main Document

#103

(#103) Second AMENDED complaint by Michael Preston, Penelope Turgeon against American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Bardo, Stacy) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#102

(#102) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Honda Motor Company, Inc. by Riley C. Mendoza and Designation of Local Counsel for Service Pursuant to Local Rule 83.15 (Mendoza, Riley) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#101

(#101) Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (aee, ) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

100 #1

*Restricted*

100 #100

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#67

No Description Available

#64

No Description Available

#66

No Description Available

#65

No Description Available

63 #2

Exhibit 2

98 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/28/2022.(jh, ) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Joint motion by Defendant American Honda Motor Company, Inc. for extension of time to 5/27/22 for Defendant to Respond to Second Amended Complaint #104 is granted. Parties shall email the Court by 6/10/22 to report on the status of the reassignment. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) NOTICE of Motion by Riley C. Mendoza for presentment of extension of time #104 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/27/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Mendoza, Riley) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) MOTION by Defendant American Honda Motor Company, Inc. for extension of time for Defendant to Respond to Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mendoza, Riley) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) Second AMENDED complaint by Michael Preston, Penelope Turgeon against American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Bardo, Stacy) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Honda Motor Company, Inc. by Riley C. Mendoza and Designation of Local Counsel for Service Pursuant to Local Rule 83.15 (Mendoza, Riley) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel of record. (aee, ) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) RECEIVED from California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-00038 (aee). (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • Docket(#99) ORDER GRANTING Motion to Transfer (Dkt. 87) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court therefore GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion to Transfer the case to the Northern District of Illinois, with the expectation that the case will be assigned to Judge Elaine E. Bucklo. The Court declines to rule on Defendants pending Motion to Dismiss. Case transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 4/6/2022.] (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • Docket(#98) SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED, on the Court's own motion, the hearings on Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division #87 and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Action for Failure to Prosecute #89 scheduled for April 4, 2022, are hereby TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. No appearance will be necessary. These matters are appropriate for resolution without hearing pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15, and will stand submitted on the papers timely filed. Accordingly, the parties' Stipulation to Permit Plaintiff's Counsel to Appear by Zoom #97 is hereby moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 4/6/2022.] (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Honda Motor Company, Inc. by Livia McCammon Kiser (Kiser, Livia) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/4/2018.] [Transferred from California Central on 4/6/2022.] (Entered: 06/15/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Honda Motor Company, Inc. by Michael L. Mallow (Mallow, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/4/2018.] [Transferred from California Central on 4/6/2022.] (Entered: 06/15/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-13280804. (Campbell, Mark) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/4/2018.] [Transferred from California Central on 4/6/2022.] (Entered: 06/15/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/4/2018.] [Transferred from California Central on 4/6/2022.] (Entered: 05/11/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. (meg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/4/2018.] [Transferred from California Central on 4/6/2022.] (Entered: 05/11/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Preston by Stacy Michelle Bardo (Bardo, Stacy) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/4/2018.] [Transferred from California Central on 4/6/2022.] (Entered: 05/11/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Preston by David M. Marco (Marco, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/4/2018.] [Transferred from California Central on 4/6/2022.] (Entered: 05/11/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Preston by Larry Paul Smith (Smith, Larry) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/4/2018.] [Transferred from California Central on 4/6/2022.] (Entered: 05/11/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Larry) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/4/2018.] [Transferred from California Central on 4/6/2022.] (Entered: 05/11/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Michael Preston; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13165958.(Smith, Larry) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/4/2018.] [Transferred from California Central on 4/6/2022.] (Entered: 05/11/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Darlene M. Cho

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark D. Campbell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Livia M. Kiser Esquire