This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2021 at 10:30:26 (UTC).

Preston et al v. USAA General Indemnity Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Preston filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against USAA General Indemnity Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian Morris and John Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00018

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Brian Morris

John Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John C. Preston

Lesa Preston

Defendants

John Does 1-5

USAA General Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Channing Hartelius

Attorney at HARTELIUS LAW CENTER PLLP

401 3Rd Ave. North, P.O. Box 1024

Great Falls, MT 59403

Defendant Attorney

Hannah R. Seifert

Attorney at SPENCER FANE, LLP

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for May 6, 2021 is RESET for May 25, 2021at 2:00 p.m. by ZOOM. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that a hearing on Defendant's #8 Motion to Dismiss will be held May 25, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. The Clerk of Court will contact the parties with the ZOOM log-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/1/2021. (ACC) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA General Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association, Corporate Parent USAA General Indemnity Company for USAA General Indemnity Company.. (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Hannah R. Seifert appearing for Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/3/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/3/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 5/3/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 3/26/2021. (MMS) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketClerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ Pursuant to L.R. 73.1 and consent of the parties having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings.. (TLO) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENTS TO USMJ. (TLO) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Channing Hartelius, Hannah R. Seifert. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 4/2/2021. (ACC) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #3 Motion is GRANTED. USAA GIC shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 1, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 3/16/2021. (ACC) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint Hannah R. Seifert appearing for Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2621566 (MMS) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to USAA General Indemnity Company. Counsel is directed to download and print issued Summonses for service. (MMS) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John C. Preston, Lesa Preston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MMS) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hannah R. Seifert