This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2020 at 10:18:08 (UTC).

President and Fellows of Harvard College et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 President and Fellows of Harvard College filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Allison D. Burroughs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11283

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Allison D. Burroughs

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

President and Fellows of Harvard College

Massachusetts Institute of Technology

Defendants

United States Department of Homeland Security

Matthew Albence

U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Chad F. Wolf

Amicus Curiae

LinkedIn Corp.

Dropbox, Inc.

The Catholic University of America

Internet Association

Cabrillo College

Twenty-six Cities and Counties

The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

University of Pittsburgh

4200 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2400

Pittsburgh, PA 15260

TechNet

Foundation for Individual Rights in Education

Student Governments of Higher Education Institutions

salesforce, inc.

New York University

American Physical Society

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William F. Lee

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP (Bos)

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Mark C. Fleming

Attorney at Wilmer Hale LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Felicia H. Ellsworth

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP (Bos)

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Ari Holtzblatt

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Michelle L. Sandals

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP (Bos)

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Alex Hemmer

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Joseph C. OKeefe

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

Eleven Times Square

New York, NY 10036-8299

Om Alladi

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

Eleven Times Square

New York, NY 10036--829

Michael J. Dundas

Attorney at Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney

City Hall East, Suite 800, 200 North Main Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Other Attorneys

Sari M Long

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1050 K Street Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20001

Lindsay C. Harrison

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

1099 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

Paul W. Hughes

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

500 North Capitol St Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Lauren J. Hartz

Attorney at Jenner & Block, LLP

1099 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

Sarah P Hogarth

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

500 North Capitol Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Michael A. Cedrone

Attorney at Stevens & Lee

100 Lenox Drive, Suite 200

Lawrenceville, NJ 08648

Carrie G. Siegrist

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP.

1050 K Street Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20001

Joshua Rosenthal

Attorney at Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.

805 15Th St., N.W. Ste. 1000

Washington, DC 20005

David P. Shouvlin

Attorney at Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur LLP

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Thomas I. Vanaskie

Attorney at Stevens and Lee

1818 Market Street, 29Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

William W. Fick

Attorney at Fick & Marx LLP

24 Federal Street, 4Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

44 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

129 #2

Exhibit 2-Certificate of Sari M. Long in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice

129 #1

Exhibit 1-Certificates of Good Standing

#129

127 #2

Exhibit 2-Certificate of Carrie Garber Siegrist in Support of Motion for Pro Hac

127 #1

Exhibit 1-Certificates of Good Standing

#127

#126

#53

#51

#2

1 #7

Summons - Albence

1 #6

Summons - Wolf

1 #5

Summons - ICE

1 #4

Summons - DHS

1 #3

Civil Category Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

166 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #129 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sari M. Long. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sari M. Long Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8346366 by American Association for the Advancement of Science. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2-Certificate of Sari M. Long in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Young, Tyler) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #127 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Carrie G. Siegrist. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Carrie Garber Siegrist Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8344694 by American Association for the Advancement of Science. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2-Certificate of Carrie Garber Siegrist in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Young, Tyler) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler A. Young on behalf of American Association for the Advancement of Science (Young, Tyler) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) PAYMENT: $200.00, receipt number 1BST081033 for MICHAEL J. DUNDAS AND DANIELLE GOLDSTEIN #51 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael J. Dundas, #53 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Danielle Goldstein (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Goldstein on behalf of Twenty-six Cities and Counties (Goldstein, Danielle) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Dundas on behalf of Twenty-six Cities and Counties (Dundas, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) NOTICE of Appearance by Ishan Bhabha on behalf of Fifty-nine Institutions of Higher Education (Bhabha, Ishan) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren J. Hartz on behalf of Fifty-nine Institutions of Higher Education (Hartz, Lauren) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2020
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLARATION re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Declaration of Cynthia Barnhart) by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ellsworth, Felicia) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLARATION re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Declaration of Mark C. Elliott) by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ellsworth, Felicia) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Declaration of Alan M. Garber) by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ellsworth, Felicia) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Declaration of Felicia Ellsworth) by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Ellsworth, Felicia) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Ellsworth, Felicia) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ellsworth, Felicia) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Massachusetts Institute of Technology identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for Massachusetts Institute of Technology.. (Ellsworth, Felicia) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by President and Fellows of Harvard College identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for President and Fellows of Harvard College.. (Ellsworth, Felicia) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, against Matthew Albence, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8318131 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Category Sheet, #4 Summons - DHS, #5 Summons - ICE, #6 Summons - Wolf, #7 Summons - Albence)(Ellsworth, Felicia) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERNET ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH is a litigant