This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2022 at 07:25:47 (UTC).

Prescott v. Alem, et al.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Prescott filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Alem. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are CJ Williams and Mark A Roberts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-03019

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CJ Williams

Referral Judge

Mark A Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roxanne Renee Prescott

Defendants

Rabi Mohmmad Walid Al Alem

MSR Transport, LLC

Amazon Logistics, Inc

Amazon.com Services, LLC

Amazon.com Services Inc

Amazon Data Services, Inc

Amazon KYDC, LLC

Amazon Retail, LLC

Esurance Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Esurance Insurance Company

Mohammad Walid Al Alem

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Sandy

Attorney at Sandy Law Firm PC

304 18Th Street

Spirit Lake, IA 51360

Thomas L Hillers

Attorney at Hope Law Firm

666 Walnut Street, Suite 2220

Des Moines, IA 50309

Defendant Attorney

Arman Nafisi

Attorney at Wilson Elser

2720 E Camelback Road, Suite 210

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Palo Alto County, case number 03741 LACV026949. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3696679), filed by Amazon. Scheduling Report due by 8/9/2022 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Document, #3 Exhibit A - Petition at Law, #4 Exhibit B - Docket, #5 Declaration) (Nafisi, Arman) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Document

1 #3

Exhibit A - Petition at Law

1 #4

Exhibit B - Docket

1 #5

Declaration

#2

(#2) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Roxanne Renee Prescott (jjh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#3

(#3) DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: New case packet attached. (jjh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSet Deadline: Defendants' LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 7/1/2022. (jjh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: New case packet attached. (jjh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Roxanne Renee Prescott (jjh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketJudge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. (conflicts checked, none found) (jjh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Palo Alto County, case number 03741 LACV026949. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3696679), filed by Amazon. Scheduling Report due by 8/9/2022 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Document, #3 Exhibit A - Petition at Law, #4 Exhibit B - Docket, #5 Declaration) (Nafisi, Arman) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon Data Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon Retail, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon Logistics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ESURANCE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant